Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Ronald Mendoza, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Kauget, Gary P, Kauget, Matthew B., against Ean Holdings Llc, Idrissa Sangare, represented by Carman, James M., Silverstein, Jonathan David, Trazzera, Liza Jane, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts with Pamela L Fisher presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 06, 2018 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: October 26, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 15, 2018ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: July 15, 2019RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: January 18, 2019NOTIFICATION FROM COURT
Date: December 11, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 26, 2018ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: February 25, 2019ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: November 06, 2019NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY
Date: August 20, 2020PRE-TRIAL DOCUMENT(S)
Date: November 10, 2020STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: July 10, 2023ORDER - OTHER
Date: March 09, 2020ANSWER
Date: January 02, 2019SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: November 06, 2018STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 06, 2018SUBPOENA ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: October 26, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 10, 2023 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
May 25, 2021 | SUBPOENA - SO ORDERED | ||
December 11, 2020 |
NOTIFICATION FROM COURT Re: Kings County Supreme Civil Court Mediation Program |
||
November 10, 2020 |
PRE-TRIAL DOCUMENT(S) Notice Pursuant to CPLR 4532a, Dr. Thomas M. Kolb |
||
October 26, 2020 |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance |
||
October 26, 2020 |
SUBPOENA ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) Judicial Subpoena |
||
August 20, 2020 | NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY | ||
March 09, 2020 |
ORDER - OTHER Final Pre-Note - dated 3/6/20 |
||
March 06, 2020 | Hearing |
Remand NOTE OF ISSUE-FINAL CONFERENCE PART FCH (Conversion) Judge: Balter, Hon. Bruce M. |
|
November 06, 2019 | ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.