Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Alexander Hykin, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Feinerman, David Alan, against Jaspreet Sandhu Md, Memorial Sloan Kettering Cancer Center, represented by Richter, Catherine, Ward, Eugene A., in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts Kings County Supreme Court with Genine Edwards presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 06, 2018 |
CategoryTorts - Medical, Dental, Or Podiatrist Malpractice |
Last RefreshedOctober 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Filing Court HouseKings County Supreme Court |
ANSWER
Date: January 09, 2019NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI)
Date: September 27, 2022ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: February 10, 2021ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: October 27, 2021ANSWER
Date: January 09, 2019STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: December 03, 2018SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: November 06, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 27, 2022 | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI) | ||
October 27, 2021 |
ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE dtd 10/20/21 (DEFAULT) |
||
February 10, 2021 | ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE | ||
December 18, 2020 | Hearing |
Mm-Alternative Dispute Res 11:00 (Conversion) Judge: Edwards, Hon. Genine D. |
|
October 06, 2020 | Hearing |
Adjourned Mm-Alternative Dispute Res 12:00 (Conversion) Judge: Edwards, Hon. Genine D. |
|
September 29, 2020 | Hearing |
Adjourned Mm-Alternative Dispute Res 3:00 (Conversion) Judge: Edwards, Hon. Genine D. |
|
September 28, 2020 | Hearing |
Adjourned Mm-Alternative Dispute Res 10:30 VIRTUAL (Conversion) Judge: Edwards, Hon. Genine D. |
|
August 10, 2020 | Hearing |
Adjourned Mm-Alternative Dispute Res 10:00 VIRTUAL (Conversion) Judge: Edwards, Hon. Genine D. |
|
July 10, 2020 | Hearing |
Adjourned Part 80 COMPL CONF (Conversion) Judge: Edwards, Hon. Genine D. |
|
June 25, 2020 | Hearing |
Adjourned CENTRAL COMPLIANCE PART 2X (Conversion) Judge: Edwards, Hon. Genine D. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.