Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
Moses Kahan, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Hamel, William R, against Avraham Liberman, represented by Gunsburg, Shlomo Z., in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts Kings County Supreme Court with Jury Coordinating Part 1 presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 06, 2018 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedJuly 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseKings County Supreme Court |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #1)
Date: January 10, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)
Date: January 10, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 07, 2019ANSWER
Date: March 07, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 26, 2018SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: November 06, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 13, 2021 | Hearing |
JURY COORDINATING PART 1 10:00AM (Conversion) Judge: Jury Coordinating Part, |
|
December 02, 2020 | Hearing |
(Motion #001) Motion Trial Term 88 ADM.ADJ (Conversion) Judge: Jimenez Salta, Hon. Dawn M. |
|
November 10, 2020 | Hearing |
Adjourned JURY COORDINATING PART 1 10:00AM (Conversion) Judge: Jury Coordinating Part, |
|
October 01, 2020 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #001) Motion Trial Term 88 ADM.ADJ (Conversion) Judge: Jimenez Salta, Hon. Dawn M. |
|
July 15, 2020 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #001) Motion Trial Term 88 ADM.ADJ (Conversion) Judge: Jimenez Salta, Hon. Dawn M. |
|
June 03, 2020 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #001) Motion Trial Term 88 ADM.ADJ (Conversion) Judge: Jimenez Salta, Hon. Dawn M. |
|
May 04, 2020 | Hearing |
Adjourned JURY COORDINATING PART 1 PRE-TRIAL (Conversion) Judge: Jury Coordinating Part, |
|
April 08, 2020 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #001) Motion Trial Term 88 PM/ADM (Conversion) Judge: Jimenez Salta, Hon. Dawn M. |
|
February 05, 2020 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #001) Motion Trial Term 88 Judge: Jimenez Salta, Hon. Dawn M. |
|
January 31, 2020 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #001) SUBSEQUENT MOTION PART Judge: Jimenez Salta, Hon. Dawn M. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.