Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
Joshua James Sereday, filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case represented by Harnick, Thomas J, Harnick, Thomas Jonathan, against The Brooklyn Union Gas Company D B A National Grid, Verizon Communications, Inc.,, represented by Crafa, Joseph R., Ginsberg, Craig Adam, Guzzo, Kiera Marie, Kelly, Gail M, Lange, Kenneth R, (total of 8) See All in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts Kings County Supreme Court with Francois A presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 06, 2018 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Negligence) |
Last RefreshedJuly 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
Filing Court HouseKings County Supreme Court |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 26, 2018ANSWER
Date: July 08, 2019ANSWER
Date: February 27, 2019ANSWER
Date: November 27, 2018SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: November 06, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 29, 2021 | Hearing |
NOTE OF ISSUE-FINAL CONFERENCE PART STIP (Conversion) Judge: Rivera, Hon. Francois A. |
|
November 13, 2020 | Hearing |
Adjourned NOTE OF ISSUE-FINAL CONFERENCE PART ADM ADJ (Conversion) Judge: Rivera, Hon. Francois A. |
|
July 10, 2020 | Hearing |
Adjourned NOTE OF ISSUE-FINAL CONFERENCE PART ADM ADJ (Conversion) Judge: Rivera, Hon. Francois A. |
|
March 20, 2020 | Hearing |
Adjourned NOTE OF ISSUE-FINAL CONFERENCE PART Judge: Rivera, Hon. Francois A. |
|
January 23, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE | |
January 13, 2020 | Hearing |
Held CENTRAL COMPLIANCE PART Supreme Trial; 2X (Conversion) Judge: Rivera, Hon. Francois A. |
|
October 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI) Consent to Change Attorney - Verizon |
|
September 11, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE | |
September 09, 2019 | Hearing |
Held CENTRAL COMPLIANCE PART Supreme Trial (Conversion) Judge: Rivera, Hon. Francois A. |
|
July 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE dtd 5/20/19 (DECISION&ORDER) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.