Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
Dvora Leah Nelken, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Bongiorno, Joseph R, against Alykhan Rafiq, Chaim D Gross, Uber Technologies, Inc., Uber-Zwanzig-Y, Llc, Volvie Gross, (total of 5) See All represented by Gunsburg, Shlomo Z., Isserlis, Nancy L, Lubin, Rory L, Mcgrane, Virginia L., Mckeon, Ryan Andrew, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts Kings County Supreme Court with Lorna Mcallister presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateNovember 06, 2018 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseKings County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time555 days |
ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: December 20, 2018STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: May 06, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 18, 2018ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: December 18, 2018ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: December 03, 2018SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: November 06, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 14, 2020 | Hearing |
Other Final Disposition (Pre-Note) PART 10 DISC/STIP (Conversion) Judge: McAllister, Hon. Lorna J. |
|
May 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance |
|
March 27, 2020 | Hearing |
Adjourned NOTE OF ISSUE-FINAL CONFERENCE PART Judge: McAllister, Hon. Lorna J. |
|
October 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE order dtd 10/18/2019 |
|
October 18, 2019 | Hearing |
Held CENTRAL COMPLIANCE PART Supreme Trial; 2X (Conversion) Judge: King, Hon. Kathy J. |
|
July 08, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE | |
June 28, 2019 | Hearing |
Held CENTRAL COMPLIANCE PART Supreme Trial (Conversion) Judge: King, Hon. Kathy J. |
|
May 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE DTD 03/14/2019 |
|
March 14, 2019 | Hearing |
Held INTAKE PART Supreme Initial (first time on) (Conversion) Judge: King, Hon. Kathy J. |
|
March 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FOR RAFIQ |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.