Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
Emerson Lainez, Josue Piza, Solange Chiriguago, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Davydov, Denis David, against Brewer Taxi Corp, Luis A. Gavilanes, Natacha Jean-Baptiste, represented by Mulholland, Rory Thomas, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts Kings County Supreme Court.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 06, 2018 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedJuly 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseKings County Supreme Court |
Case Cycle Time38 days |
ANSWER
Date: December 14, 2018SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: November 06, 2018STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 19, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
ANSWER Notice of Appearance, Verified Answer, Cross-Complaint & Demands |
|
December 05, 2018 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
November 20, 2018 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
November 19, 2018 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | |
November 19, 2018 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
November 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons & Complaint with Plaintiffs Verification |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.