Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Naquan Hills, filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case represented by Ross, James Franklin, against New York Police Department, The City Of New York, represented by Counsel, Corporation, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts Kings County Supreme Court with Rosemarie Montalbano presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 06, 2018 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (False Arrest) |
Last RefreshedJune 04, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
Filing Court HouseKings County Supreme Court |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: November 06, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 04, 2021 | Hearing |
Note Of Issue/City, No Apps
Judge: Montalbano, Hon. Rosemarie |
|
October 13, 2020 | Hearing |
Held CITY 22 Supreme Trial (Conversion) Judge: Montalbano, Hon. Rosemarie |
|
February 20, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE | |
January 07, 2020 | Hearing |
Held CITY 22 Supreme Trial (Conversion) Judge: Montalbano, Hon. Rosemarie |
|
June 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE DTD 04/15/2019 |
|
April 15, 2019 | Hearing |
Held CITY 22 Supreme Initial (first time on) (Conversion) Judge: Boddie, Hon. Reginald A. |
|
February 13, 2019 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | |
November 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE The City of New York & NYC Police Department |
|
November 06, 2018 | Docket Event | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.