Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
Kirk C. Teesdale, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Irwin, Joshua Brian, against Forrester'S Towing, Inc., Ryan Aron Forrester, represented by Konigsberg, Matthew Fernandez, Pasternak, David Seth, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts Kings County Supreme Court with Wavny Toussaint presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 06, 2018 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedJuly 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseKings County Supreme Court |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #1)
Date: May 25, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)
Date: May 25, 2020ANSWER
Date: February 04, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 23, 2018SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: November 06, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 19, 2021 | Hearing |
NOTE OF ISSUE-FINAL CONFERENCE PART REMOTE FCH ORD, 8/7/20 LC-FCP (Conversion) Judge: Wan, Hon. Lillian |
|
September 30, 2020 | Hearing |
Withdrawn (Motion #001) Motion Trial Term 17 Judge: Wan, Hon. Lillian |
|
August 05, 2020 | Hearing |
Adjourned NOTE OF ISSUE-FINAL CONFERENCE PART ADM ADJ (Conversion) Judge: Wan, Hon. Lillian |
|
July 29, 2020 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #001) Motion Trial Term 17 Judge: Wan, Hon. Lillian |
|
June 23, 2020 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #001) SUBSEQUENT MOTION PART Judge: Wan, Hon. Lillian |
|
May 29, 2020 | Motion |
Judgment - Summary (Motion #001) Decided: 09/30/2020Withdrawn Before Justice: Wan, Hon. Lillian Answer demanded: Yes Judge: Wan, Hon. Lillian |
|
May 25, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #1) | |
May 25, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) | |
May 25, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 5 (Motion #1) Plaintiff's Affidavit |
|
May 25, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 4 (Motion #1) Police Accident Report |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.