Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Dorothy Watts, In The Matter Of Dorothy Watts By Administratrix Camille Ngyou, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Borrell, Jeffrey Francis Peter, against 1772 Rockaway Parkway Corp., Canarsie Burgers, L.L.C. A K A Burger King, Canarsie Laundry Depot, Llc, represented by Brown, Lindsey Taylor, Crane, Christine Marie, Mascolo, Neil C., Murray-Nolan, Gwyneth Kathleen, Pecorelli, Frank J., (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts Kings County Supreme Court with Aaron Maslow presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 06, 2018 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Slip And Fall) |
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
Filing Court HouseKings County Supreme Court |
MEMORANDUM
Date: March 23, 2020DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: January 11, 2019ANSWER
Date: January 11, 2019SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: November 06, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 11, 2023 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
August 11, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
August 11, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #4) Affidavit of Service |
||
August 11, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #4) Default Letter |
||
August 11, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #4) Supplemental Summons and Amended Complaint |
||
August 11, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #4) Summons and Complaint |
||
August 11, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION | ||
August 10, 2023 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND Response to Plaintiff's Demand for BP as to AD |
||
August 10, 2023 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND Response to Plaintiff's NDI |
||
July 05, 2023 |
ORDER - OTHER Final Pre-Note Dated June 26, 2023 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.