Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Phil Un Hwang As Administrator Of The Estate Of Young Kil Sim, Phil Un Hwang Individually, filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case represented by Bernstein, Mark R., Viener, Joseph B, Villeck, Michael Frederick, against Kp Farm Market Corp., Madison Realty Management Corp., Nostrand Retail Group Llc, represented by Lee, John Hyuk, Norton, Keith J, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts Kings County Supreme Court with Francois A presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 06, 2018 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Wrongful Death) |
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
Filing Court HouseKings County Supreme Court |
STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: November 26, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #4)
Date: August 31, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 25, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #4)
Date: August 31, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #4)
Date: August 31, 2022AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 20, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #3) Pleadings
Date: September 17, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #2)
Date: January 28, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 20, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 20, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #2)
Date: January 28, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #4)
Date: August 31, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: August 25, 2020NOTIFICATION FROM COURT
Date: December 11, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #4)
Date: August 31, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #4)
Date: August 31, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #4)
Date: August 31, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: September 28, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: September 17, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #4)
Date: September 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #4)
Date: September 28, 2022NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY
Date: October 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #4)
Date: August 31, 2022ORDER - OTHER
Date: October 12, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: September 17, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 20, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2)
Date: January 28, 2020ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: October 30, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #3)
Date: September 17, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #3)
Date: September 17, 2020ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: October 28, 2020LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: August 30, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 17, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #3)
Date: November 12, 2020COURT NOTICE
Date: November 11, 2020NOTICE
Date: August 01, 2020NOTICE
Date: September 26, 2020NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: January 28, 2020ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: July 23, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 03, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 03, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 16, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 16, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 16, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #4)
Date: August 31, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #4)
Date: August 31, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 16, 2022AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 16, 2022RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: June 24, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: November 14, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 03, 2018ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: December 05, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 20, 2020THIRD PARTY SUMMONS/COMPLAINT
Date: November 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 20, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 20, 2020STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 16, 2022STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 14, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #6)
Date: June 14, 2023RESPONSE TO STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #6)
Date: June 14, 2023STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #6)
Date: April 20, 2023STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF HEARING Â (Motion #6)
Date: May 01, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #6)
Date: June 20, 2023ADMISSION OF SERVICE Â (Motion #5)
Date: April 14, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #5)
Date: April 13, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: June 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #5)
Date: April 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #5)
Date: April 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #5)
Date: April 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #5)
Date: April 13, 2023STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF HEARING Â (Motion #5)
Date: May 01, 2023SUPPORTING PAPERS TO MOTION Â (Motion #5)
Date: April 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #5)
Date: April 13, 2023SUPPORTING PAPERS TO MOTION Â (Motion #5)
Date: April 14, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #6)
Date: April 20, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #6)
Date: April 20, 2023ADMISSION OF SERVICE Â (Motion #5)
Date: April 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #5)
Date: April 13, 2023NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #6)
Date: April 20, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #6)
Date: June 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #5)
Date: April 13, 2023STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 18, 2020STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 18, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: January 28, 2020MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 20, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 20, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 20, 2020ANSWER
Date: March 01, 2019ANSWER
Date: January 17, 2020STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: December 20, 2019ANSWER
Date: January 16, 2019SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: November 06, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 20, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #6) 02. Affid Serv - REPLY AFF (MS6) NYSCEF-E-Mail 6-20-23 |
||
June 20, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY | ||
June 20, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #6) 01. HWANG_SJ_REPLY (MS6) - MRB Signed |
||
June 14, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO CROSS-MOTION (Motion #6) Affirmation in Opposition to Ptfs Cross Motion for SJ |
||
June 14, 2023 |
RESPONSE TO STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS (Motion #6) Response to Plaintiff's Statement of Material Facts and Counter Statement |
||
May 01, 2023 |
STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF HEARING (Motion #6) Stipulation adjourning Motions (#5 and 6) from 5/3 to 6/21 |
||
May 01, 2023 |
STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF HEARING (Motion #5) Stipulation adjourning Motions (#5 and 6) from 5/3 to 6/21 |
||
April 20, 2023 |
STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS (Motion #6) 03. HWANG_SMF_X-Mot - Signed |
||
April 20, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #6) 04. Affid Serv - X-MOT SJ (MS5) NYSCEF-E-Mail 4-20-2023 |
||
April 20, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION (Motion #6) 02. HWANG_SJ_Affm for X-Mot - MS5 - MRB Signed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.