Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Kim Mallet v. Bessie Mae Rosenthal
A Torts - Motor Vehicle case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Kings County. Judge Johnny Lee Baynes presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
November 06, 2018
Last Refreshed
August 01, 2023
Filing Location
Kings County, NY
Category
Torts - Motor Vehicle
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Status
Closed
Case Duration
2 years and 7 days
Overview
Causes of Action
1. ON BEHALF OF PLAINTIFF KIM MALLET
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: Oct 08, 2020ORDER - OTHER (Motion 1)
Date: Sep 01, 2020ORDER - OTHER (Motion 1)
Date: Jul 06, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: May 07, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: May 05, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: May 05, 2020ORDER - OTHER
Date: Nov 12, 2019ANSWER
Date: Jan 03, 2019SUMMONS COMPLAINT
Date: Nov 06, 2018Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 12, 2020 | hearing |
Other Final Disposition (Pre-Note) NOTE OF ISSUE-FINAL CONFERENCE PART STD (Conversion) Judge: Joseph, Hon. Ingrid |
|
October 27, 2020 | NOTICE | ||
October 08, 2020 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
September 01, 2020 |
ORDER - OTHER (Motion #1) dated 8/27/20 |
||
August 27, 2020 | hearing |
Decided (Motion #001) CENTRAL COMPLIANCE PART GEXT (Conversion) Judge: Central Compliance Part, |
|
July 10, 2020 | hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #001) CENTRAL COMPLIANCE PART Judge: Central Compliance Part, |
|
July 10, 2020 | hearing |
Adjourned NOTE OF ISSUE-FINAL CONFERENCE PART ADM ADJ (Conversion) Judge: Joseph, Hon. Ingrid |
|
July 06, 2020 |
ORDER - OTHER (Motion #1) dated 07/01/2020 |
||
July 01, 2020 | hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #001) CENTRAL COMPLIANCE PART Judge: Central Compliance Part, |
|
June 12, 2020 | Motion |
Dismiss (Motion #001) Decided: 08/27/2020Granted Before Justice: Knipel, Hon. Lawrence S. Answer demanded: Yes Judge: Knipel, Hon. Lawrence S. |
|
June 03, 2020 | hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #001) SUBSEQUENT MOTION PART Judge: Central Compliance Part, |
|
May 07, 2020 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Plaintiff's response |
||
May 07, 2020 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION | ||
May 05, 2020 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
May 05, 2020 |
EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #1) Good Faith Letter |
||
May 05, 2020 |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #1) Further CC Order |
||
May 05, 2020 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) Demand |
||
May 05, 2020 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) CC Order |
||
May 05, 2020 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) PC Order |
||
May 05, 2020 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Answer |
||
May 05, 2020 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) S&C |
||
May 05, 2020 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION | ||
May 05, 2020 | AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH | ||
March 20, 2020 | hearing |
Adjourned NOTE OF ISSUE-FINAL CONFERENCE PART Judge: Joseph, Hon. Ingrid |
|
November 12, 2019 |
ORDER - OTHER Central Compliance Part Conference - dated 11/8/19 |
||
November 08, 2019 | hearing |
Held CENTRAL COMPLIANCE PART Supreme Trial; 2X (Conversion) Judge: Joseph, Hon. Ingrid |
|
July 23, 2019 |
ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE order dated July 19, 2019 |
||
July 19, 2019 | hearing |
Held CENTRAL COMPLIANCE PART Supreme Trial (Conversion) Judge: Joseph, Hon. Ingrid |
|
March 11, 2019 | BILL OF PARTICULARS | ||
March 04, 2019 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
March 01, 2019 | hearing |
Held INTAKE PART Supreme Initial (first time on) (Conversion) Judge: Joseph, Hon. Ingrid |
|
January 30, 2019 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
January 03, 2019 | ANSWER | ||
November 06, 2018 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |