Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Abimbola Ayorinde, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Kauget, Matthew B., against Kevin Cabral, Riah A Cabral, represented by Ciluffo, Jason Anthony, Tobin, Deirdre Joyce, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts Kings County Supreme Court with Karen B presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 02, 2016 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseKings County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time978 days |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #1)
Date: July 27, 2018STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 02, 2016STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 22, 2017STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 24, 2017ORDER - OTHER (Motion #1)
Date: August 24, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #1)
Date: July 27, 2018NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)
Date: July 27, 2018ANSWER
Date: February 22, 2017SUMMONS + COMPLAINT *Corrected*
Date: December 12, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 07, 2019 | Hearing |
Settled JURY COORDINATING PART 1 3SEL801 (Conversion) Judge: Kurtz, Hon. Donald Scott |
|
August 01, 2019 | Hearing |
Adjourned JURY COORDINATING PART 1 2SEL522 (Conversion) Judge: Jury Coordinating Part, |
|
May 22, 2019 | Hearing |
Adjourned JURY COORDINATING PART 1 1SE0319 (Conversion) Judge: Jury Coordinating Part, |
|
March 19, 2019 | Hearing |
Adjourned JURY COORDINATING PART 1 PRE-TRIAL (Conversion) Judge: Jury Coordinating Part, |
|
August 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
ORDER - OTHER (Motion #1) Centralized Compliance - dated 8/16/18 |
|
August 16, 2018 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #001) CENTRAL COMPLIANCE PART GEXT (Conversion) Judge: Central Compliance Part, |
|
July 30, 2018 | Motion |
Vacate/Strike - Note of Issue/Jury Demand/From Trial Calendar (Motion #001) Decided: 08/16/2018Granted Before Justice: Central Compliance Part, Answer demanded: Yes Judge: Central Compliance Part, |
|
July 27, 2018 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #1) | |
July 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) Good Faith Letter |
|
July 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) Note of Issue |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.