Case Last Refreshed: 23 hours ago
Jane Doe, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Giuffra, Thomas Peter, against Diocese Of Brooklyn, Fr. Bony Monastere, Holy Family-St. Laurence R.C. Parish, St. Therese Of Lisieux R.C. Church, represented by Peknic, Charles Martin, Scahill, Francis J, White, Christopher John, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts Supreme with Robin Sheares presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 27, 2023 |
CategoryTorts - Adult Survivors Act |
Last RefreshedMay 02, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseSupreme |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 09, 2024PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: March 20, 2024CERTIFICATION OF SIGNATURE ( ATTORNEY OR PARTY )
Date: December 22, 2023STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: October 19, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 15, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 22, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: December 22, 2023NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION
Date: December 22, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 18, 2023SUMMONS-SUPPLEMENTAL (POST RJI)
Date: November 03, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 24, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 03, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) *Corrected*
Date: July 27, 2023COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: November 03, 2023NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION
Date: October 24, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 26, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 23, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 15, 2023AFFIRMATION *Corrected*
Date: July 27, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 04, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: July 27, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY/COPY OF ENTERED ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE *Corrected*
Date: August 04, 2023RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: July 27, 2023DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: December 22, 2023ANSWER
Date: December 22, 2023DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: December 21, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: December 21, 2023ANSWER
Date: December 21, 2023ANSWER
Date: October 24, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 21, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 20, 2024 |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST Redacted per 22 NYCRR §202.5(e) |
||
February 09, 2024 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
December 22, 2023 | CERTIFICATION OF SIGNATURE ( ATTORNEY OR PARTY ) | ||
December 22, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
December 22, 2023 |
DEMAND FOR: Discovery and Inspection |
||
December 22, 2023 | NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION | ||
December 22, 2023 | DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS | ||
December 22, 2023 | ANSWER | ||
December 21, 2023 | Demand for Bill of Particulars | ||
December 21, 2023 |
DEMAND FOR: Combined Demands for Discovery and Inspection |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.