Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Yevgeny Levin, filed a(n) Slander,Libel,Defamation - Torts case represented by Levin, Yevgeny, against Richard W Young, represented by Morris, Cory Hal, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts with Wayne Saitta presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWayne Saitta Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 26, 2023 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Defamation) |
Last RefreshedJanuary 23, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeSlander,Libel,Defamation |
EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: November 18, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: January 17, 2024RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: November 18, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 0
Date: December 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: November 18, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: January 22, 2024SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: July 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: January 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3
Date: January 17, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: November 18, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - CONFORMED COPY
Date: December 14, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: January 17, 2024ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED
Date: December 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G
Date: November 18, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F
Date: November 18, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: November 18, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: November 18, 2023STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS
Date: November 18, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (PROPOSED)
Date: November 18, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW
Date: November 18, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: July 26, 2023AFFIRMATION
Date: November 18, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 22, 2024 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY | ||
January 22, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Reply Affirmation A - Peter Tamsen, Esq. Affirmation |
||
January 17, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Defendant's Defamatory Affirmation |
||
January 17, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 Affidavit in Support of Attorney Affirmation in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss/Summary Judgment/ Or Affidavit in Support of Attorney Affirmation in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss/Summary Judgment/ Or ... show more |
||
January 17, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 3 Affidavit |
||
January 17, 2024 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Attorney Affirmation in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss/Summary Judgment/ Order to Show Cause |
||
December 14, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 0 Electronic Mail Service upon YEVGENY LEVIN |
||
December 14, 2023 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - CONFORMED COPY | ||
December 14, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
December 13, 2023 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.