Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Sandra Labelson, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Firestein, Jason Stuart, Zlotolow, Scott Jeffrey, against The City Of New York, represented by Alleyne, Aisha Nichol, Counsel, Corporation, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts with Kings Cdp7 presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKings Cdp7 Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 26, 2023 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Premises Liability) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 02, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 28, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: November 20, 2023BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: December 29, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: December 29, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 28, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 28, 2023RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: December 29, 2023AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH
Date: November 20, 2023ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: November 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 20, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: November 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 20, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: July 26, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 29, 2023 |
BILL OF PARTICULARS Supplemental Bill of Particulars |
||
December 29, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY | ||
December 29, 2023 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND Additional Photos |
||
December 28, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Notice of Claim |
||
December 28, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) City's CSO Response |
||
December 28, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #1) Affirmation in Opposition |
||
November 20, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION | ||
November 20, 2023 | AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH | ||
November 20, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Email to Court requesting modification of case scheduling order |
||
November 20, 2023 | NOTICE OF MOTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.