Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Kenneth Griffin, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Subin, Herbert S, against Bainbridge Cluster Associates L.P., represented by Barresi, Michael Joseph, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts Kings County Supreme Court with Landicino presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 13, 2017 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Personal Injury) |
Last RefreshedJanuary 06, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Filing Court HouseKings County Supreme Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 10, 2019 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #006) CENTRAL COMPLIANCE PART GEXT (Conversion) Judge: Central Compliance Part, |
|
November 07, 2019 | Motion |
Dismiss (Motion #006) Decided: 12/10/2019Granted Before Justice: Central Compliance Part, Answer demanded: Yes Judge: Central Compliance Part, |
|
September 25, 2019 | Hearing |
Fully Submitted (Motion #005) Motion Oral Argument, Part 81 Judge: Landicino, Hon. Carl J. |
|
July 17, 2019 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #005) Motion Term 81 APO/CONS (Conversion) Judge: Landicino, Hon. Carl J. |
|
July 17, 2019 | Hearing |
Withdrawn (Motion #004) Motion Term 81 SOS (Conversion) Judge: Landicino, Hon. Carl J. |
|
May 08, 2019 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #005) Motion Term 81 SOS (Conversion) Judge: Landicino, Hon. Carl J. |
|
May 08, 2019 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #004) Motion Term 81 SOS, W/MS-5 (Conversion) Judge: Landicino, Hon. Carl J. |
|
April 24, 2019 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #004) Motion Term 81 APS, W/MS-5 (Conversion) Judge: Landicino, Hon. Carl J. |
|
April 23, 2019 | Hearing |
Remand NOTE OF ISSUE-FINAL CONFERENCE PART VNI/SFO (Conversion) Judge: Landicino, Hon. Carl J. |
|
March 25, 2019 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #004) SUBSEQUENT MOTION PART Judge: Landicino, Hon. Carl J. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.