Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Klara Khutoryanskaya, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Karasik, Alexander, against Alexander Rabinovich M.D., Brooklyn Eye Surgery Center L.L.C. D B A Brooklyn Eye Surgery Center, John And Jane Does 1 - 100, Laser & Microsurgery, P.C. D B A Ny Lasik Laser & Microsurgery Institute, represented by Blazowski, Maureen P., Kroczynski, Thomas Joseph, Meyer, Deborah I., Verbos, Megan Elizabeth, Wild, Jacqueline A., (total of 12) See All in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts Kings County Supreme Court with Kings Mmtrp presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 02, 2016 |
CategoryTorts - Medical, Dental, Or Podiatrist Malpractice |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1005 days |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
|
Filing Court HouseKings County Supreme Court |
Case Cycle Time1036 days |
DEMAND FOR:
Date: January 26, 2017ANSWER
Date: January 26, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: May 09, 2018DEMAND FOR:
Date: March 31, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 04, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: October 23, 2017STIPULATION - OTHER Â (Motion #3)
Date: May 21, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 04, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: October 23, 2017SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 02, 2016ANSWER
Date: November 16, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #4)
Date: January 15, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: May 09, 2018ANSWER
Date: January 11, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #4)
Date: January 15, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: January 25, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: January 25, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #5)
Date: January 17, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: July 22, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #8)
Date: November 01, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #8)
Date: November 01, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #7) *Corrected*
Date: February 26, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: February 14, 2019JUDGMENT
Date: October 04, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: January 13, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #8)
Date: December 20, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: April 05, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: July 26, 2019STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION
Date: March 13, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #6)
Date: April 08, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: March 08, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #6)
Date: July 23, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #8)
Date: January 15, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #7) *Corrected*
Date: February 26, 2019STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: September 25, 2019ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM Â (Motion #6)
Date: January 27, 2020ORDER - OTHER Â (Motion #7)
Date: August 02, 2019ORDER - OTHER
Date: May 18, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 04, 2017DEMAND FOR:
Date: January 11, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #4)
Date: January 15, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2)
Date: October 23, 2017RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: March 31, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 04, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 13, 2016PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: March 31, 2017CERTIFICATE OF MERIT
Date: December 08, 2016ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: May 18, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 31, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 04, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 31, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 04, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 04, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 19, 2016AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 19, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 04, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #4)
Date: January 15, 2019AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #3)
Date: May 21, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #5)
Date: January 17, 2019NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION
Date: January 17, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #6)
Date: January 25, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #6) Laser MRs P1 redacted Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: January 25, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #6) Dep Tran Day 1- Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: January 25, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #6)
Date: January 25, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #7)
Date: July 26, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #4)
Date: January 15, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #6) BP Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: January 25, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #4)
Date: January 15, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #5)
Date: January 17, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #6) Brooklyn-Eye-Recs- Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: January 25, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #4)
Date: January 15, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - J2 Â (Motion #6) Laser-MRs--P2- Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: January 25, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #6) Consent Form Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: January 25, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #6)
Date: January 25, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #6)
Date: January 25, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #8)
Date: November 01, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #8)
Date: November 01, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #8)
Date: November 01, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #8)
Date: November 01, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #8)
Date: November 01, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 14, 2019NOTICE OF ENTRY/COPY OF ENTERED ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: August 12, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #5)
Date: February 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #7)
Date: February 26, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #8)
Date: November 01, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #8)
Date: November 01, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #5)
Date: February 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #8)
Date: November 01, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #7)
Date: February 26, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #8)
Date: November 01, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 12, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #7)
Date: February 26, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #7)
Date: February 26, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - P Â (Motion #8) DR FELL RECORDS Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: November 01, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #8) BROOKLYN EYE CENTER RECORDS Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: November 01, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #8) DR WEN RECORDS Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: November 01, 2019JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED)
Date: September 03, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #8) DR. RUBINCHIK RECORDS Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: November 01, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #8)
Date: November 01, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #8)
Date: November 01, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 03, 2019NOTICE OF ENTRY/COPY OF ENTERED ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: October 04, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #8)
Date: November 01, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #8)
Date: November 01, 2019AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #7)
Date: February 26, 2019AFFIRMATION
Date: September 03, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 04, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #7)
Date: February 26, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #7)
Date: February 26, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #7)
Date: February 26, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #7)
Date: February 26, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #7) *Corrected*
Date: February 26, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #7)
Date: February 26, 2019AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH
Date: May 09, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #2)
Date: October 23, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #2)
Date: October 23, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #3)
Date: May 09, 2018ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: October 23, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 23, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 26, 2017NOTICE OF MEDICAL MALPRACTICE
Date: December 15, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #3)
Date: May 09, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #3)
Date: May 09, 2018NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY *Corrected*
Date: December 28, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #3)
Date: May 09, 2018AFFIRMATION
Date: November 16, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 15, 2017AFFIRMATION
Date: March 08, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #3)
Date: May 09, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #3)
Date: May 09, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #3)
Date: May 09, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 09, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #4)
Date: January 15, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #6)
Date: January 25, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #4)
Date: January 15, 2019AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH Â (Motion #4)
Date: January 15, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #7)
Date: February 26, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - Q Â (Motion #8) DR. SEEDOR RECORDS Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: November 01, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #7)
Date: February 26, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #7)
Date: February 26, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #4)
Date: January 15, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #7)
Date: February 26, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #7)
Date: February 26, 2019ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: February 27, 2019SUR-REPLY
Date: December 17, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #7)
Date: February 26, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #6)
Date: March 08, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #6)
Date: December 17, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #6)
Date: March 08, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #6)
Date: March 08, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #7)
Date: April 05, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #7)
Date: April 05, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #6)
Date: March 08, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #6)
Date: March 08, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #7)
Date: April 05, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #7)
Date: April 05, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 05, 2019SUR-REPLY Â (Motion #7)
Date: July 23, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #7)
Date: April 05, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #6)
Date: April 08, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #6) Exhibit B of Reply Affirmation Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: April 08, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #7)
Date: April 05, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #6) *Corrected*
Date: April 08, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #7)
Date: July 26, 2019SUR-REPLY Â (Motion #7)
Date: July 26, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #7)
Date: July 26, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #7)
Date: July 23, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #6)
Date: July 24, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #7)
Date: July 23, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #7)
Date: July 26, 2019AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #7)
Date: July 26, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #6)
Date: December 17, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #6)
Date: December 17, 2019NOTICE OF APPEAL/INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: February 11, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - R Â (Motion #6)
Date: December 20, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #8)
Date: December 20, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 17, 2019NOTICE OF ENTRY/COPY OF ENTERED ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: February 06, 2020NOTICE OF APPEAL/INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: February 07, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - S Â (Motion #6)
Date: December 20, 2019SUR-REPLY Â (Motion #6)
Date: December 20, 2019NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)
Date: March 25, 2020SUR-REPLY
Date: January 21, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 15, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #8)
Date: January 15, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 04, 2022CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: November 04, 2022ORDER - OTHER
Date: July 03, 2018ORDER - OTHER
Date: January 12, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 04, 2022 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
November 04, 2022 | CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI) | ||
April 22, 2020 | Hearing |
MED MAL TRIAL READINESS PART TRIAL (Conversion) Judge: Med Mal Trial Readiness Part, |
|
March 25, 2020 | Docket Event | NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION) | |
February 11, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEAL/INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE | |
February 10, 2020 | Hearing |
Adjourned MED MAL TRIAL READINESS PART Judge: Med Mal Trial Readiness Part, |
|
February 07, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEAL/INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE | |
February 06, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY/COPY OF ENTERED ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE | |
January 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM (Motion #6) order dtd 1/23/2020 signed by Hon. Graham. Also MS 8 |
|
January 23, 2020 | Hearing |
Denied (Motion #008) Motion Trial Term 36 Judge: Graham, Hon. Bernard J. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.