Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Rudolph Cherry, filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case represented by Kerner, Matthew Harris, Liakas, Dean Nicholas, against Kareem, Llc, Key Food Market, Inc., represented by Schneider, Michael R, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts with Peter P. Sweeney presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 19, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Negligence) |
Last RefreshedOctober 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 19, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: May 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: May 23, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: May 16, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: August 30, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: November 24, 2021NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: March 22, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: November 24, 2021NOTICE TO ADMIT
Date: May 06, 2022DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: November 24, 2021AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #1)
Date: May 23, 2022STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: June 01, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: May 23, 2022STIPULATION - AMENDING PLEADING(S)
Date: June 01, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: May 23, 2022STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: October 14, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: May 23, 2022PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: May 16, 2022RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: May 16, 2022ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: November 24, 2021NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI)
Date: October 14, 2022ANSWER (AMENDED)
Date: June 01, 2022ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: June 23, 2022ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: December 16, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 12, 2023 | AFFIRMATION | ||
October 12, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Closing Documents |
||
October 12, 2023 | BILL OF COSTS | ||
October 12, 2023 | JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) | ||
December 16, 2022 |
ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE Dated December 14, 2022 |
||
October 14, 2022 | STIPULATION - OTHER | ||
October 14, 2022 | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI) | ||
June 23, 2022 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
June 01, 2022 |
STIPULATION - OTHER STIPULATION TO WITHDRAW-NOTICE OF ADMIT |
||
June 01, 2022 |
STIPULATION - AMENDING PLEADING(S) STIPULATION TO AMEND VERIFIED ANSWER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.