Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Matthew Uecker Individually And On Behalf All Others Similarly Situated, filed a(n) Wage and Hour - Labor and Employment case represented by Davidson, Jennifer Marie, Stewart, Melissa Lardo, against Alphasense, Inc., represented by Rutigliano, Paul Joseph, Yaqoob, Mohammad Adil, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts with Carolyn E Wade presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCarolyn E Wade Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 21, 2022 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Unpaid Overtime Wages) |
Last RefreshedDecember 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeWage and Hour |
NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: October 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #2)
Date: October 31, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: November 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #2)
Date: October 31, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: October 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #2)
Date: October 31, 2023ORDER - OTHER
Date: July 21, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: October 31, 2023NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI)
Date: October 05, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 18, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: August 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: July 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 18, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 18, 2022ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE
Date: August 08, 2022SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: July 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 18, 2022RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: August 18, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 28, 2023 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
November 20, 2023 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
October 31, 2023 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
October 31, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #2) Settlement Agreement |
||
October 31, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #2) Proposed Order |
||
October 31, 2023 | MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT | ||
October 31, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #2) Affirmation of Lisa Pavlik of Rust Consulting |
||
October 31, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION | ||
July 21, 2023 |
ORDER - OTHER dtd 07/14/2023 nsp |
||
October 05, 2022 | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.