Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
Iraida Lopez, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Mueller, Eric P, against Alliance Funding, John Doe, Superior Bank, Fsb, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts Kings County Supreme Court with Carolyn E. Wade presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 02, 2018 |
CategoryOther Real Property - Non-Mortgage Foreclosure |
Last RefreshedJuly 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseKings County Supreme Court |
RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: October 03, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: October 02, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - A2
Date: October 03, 2018AFFIDAVIT
Date: October 03, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: October 03, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - A 1
Date: October 03, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: October 09, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: October 03, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - A2
Date: October 09, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - F
Date: October 03, 2018AFFIDAVIT
Date: October 09, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - G
Date: October 03, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: October 09, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: October 03, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - A1
Date: October 09, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 16, 2018SUMMONS
Date: October 02, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 16, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: October 09, 2018AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 16, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: October 02, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - A 1 Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 16, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: October 09, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: October 03, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - G
Date: October 09, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 16, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: October 02, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 16, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - A 2 Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 16, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - F
Date: October 09, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 16, 2018NOTIFICATION FROM COURT
Date: December 11, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 16, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 16, 2018NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: November 16, 2018ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: October 03, 2018ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: October 03, 2018COMPLAINT
Date: October 02, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 11, 2020 |
NOTIFICATION FROM COURT Re: Kings County Supreme Civil Court Mediation Program |
||
January 25, 2019 | Hearing |
Granted (Motion #001) Motion Term 84 SON (Conversion) Judge: Wade, Hon. Carolyn E. |
|
November 27, 2018 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #001) MOTION PART Judge: Wade, Hon. Carolyn E. |
|
November 16, 2018 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
November 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #1) Federal Reserve Printout |
|
November 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) Affirmation in Support of Eric Mueller, Esq. |
|
November 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A 1 (Motion #1) Summons and Complaint Part 1 |
|
November 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #1) ACRIS Printout |
|
November 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Alliance Mortgage |
|
November 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A 2 (Motion #1) Summons and Complaint Part 2 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.