Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
Angelica Maria Rosales, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Redmond, Cornelius Joseph, against The Brooklyn Hospital Center, represented by Agins, Hillary Carlton, Brennan, Patrick J., Bustillos Varela, Jose Luis, Drummond, Kaitlin Stavnitsky, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts Kings County Supreme Court with Lillian Wan presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 02, 2018 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Premises Liability) |
Last RefreshedJuly 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
Filing Court HouseKings County Supreme Court |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: October 02, 2018DEMAND FOR:
Date: December 10, 2018PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: May 23, 2019NOTICE
Date: October 27, 2020RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: May 23, 2019ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: December 19, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 19, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 17, 2018ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: October 08, 2019AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH
Date: August 23, 2022ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 16, 2022NOTIFICATION FROM COURT
Date: December 11, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 19, 2022ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: June 19, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: August 19, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: August 19, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: February 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 06, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: February 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 06, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #2) *Corrected*
Date: February 06, 2023ORDER - OTHER
Date: March 06, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: March 13, 2023DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: December 10, 2018ANSWER
Date: December 10, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 13, 2023 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
March 06, 2023 | ORDER - OTHER | ||
February 06, 2023 | MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT | ||
February 06, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #2) Proposed Discovery plan |
||
February 06, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #2) Print out from E-track |
||
February 06, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION | ||
February 06, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #2) Copy of the CC Order |
||
February 06, 2023 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #2) *Corrected* Notice of Motion+ Affirmation of Good faith |
||
September 16, 2022 |
ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM (Motion #1) Dated: September 9, 2022 |
||
August 23, 2022 | AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.