Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Brendon Campbell, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Belkin, Lara Dewan, London, Cary Louis, Robin, Caitlin Anne, against Police Officer Andre Gregory Shield No. 19779, Police Officer Leroux Shield No. 4766, Police Officers John Does One Through Ten, Sergeant Bakka Shield No. 741, The City Of New York, (total of 5) See All represented by Counsel, Corporation, Milanese, Thomas Jay, Shea, Annmargaret, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts with Kings Cdp7 presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 25, 2020 |
CategoryTorts - Other (False Arrest) |
Last RefreshedJuly 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
ANSWER
Date: November 25, 2020AFFIDAVIT
Date: October 12, 2020RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: January 04, 2021ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: March 22, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: October 12, 2020AFFIDAVIT
Date: October 12, 2020AFFIDAVIT
Date: October 12, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 29, 2021PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: January 04, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 29, 2021AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 29, 2021STIPULATION - WITHDRAWING MOTION/ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: October 18, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 29, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 29, 2021ANSWER (AMENDED)
Date: October 15, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 29, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: December 08, 2021ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: January 14, 2022ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: January 21, 2022CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: December 08, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: January 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #2) Exhibit B- Verified Bill of Particulars Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: January 03, 2023STIPULATION - OTHER Â (Motion #2)
Date: January 09, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: January 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #2)
Date: January 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2)
Date: January 03, 2023ORDER - OTHER Â (Motion #2)
Date: January 17, 2023STIPULATION - DISCOVERY ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: March 01, 2023ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: March 10, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 25, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 10, 2023 |
ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE dtd 3/2/23 |
||
March 01, 2023 | STIPULATION - DISCOVERY ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) | ||
January 17, 2023 |
ORDER - OTHER (Motion #2) dated 1/11/23 |
||
January 09, 2023 | STIPULATION - OTHER (Motion #2) | ||
January 03, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION | ||
January 03, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #2) Exhibit B- Verified Bill of Particulars Redacted per 22 NYCRR Exhibit B- Verified Bill of Particulars Redacted |
||
January 03, 2023 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
January 03, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #2) Exhibit C - Compliance Order |
||
January 03, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint |
||
January 21, 2022 |
ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE dtd 1/11/22 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.