Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Kerol Blair, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Mosaku, Adewale Akim, against The City Of New York, represented by Abdelaal, Heba, Counsel, Corporation, Islami, Filloreta, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts with Kings Cdp20 presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKings Cdp20 Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 22, 2020 |
CategoryTorts - Other (False Arrest/Imprisonment) |
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 22, 2020ANSWER
Date: April 26, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 03, 2022RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: July 25, 2021AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH
Date: October 03, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 03, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: October 03, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 03, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: October 03, 2022STIPULATION - DISCOVERY ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: July 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 03, 2022ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: August 26, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 03, 2022ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: July 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: May 31, 2023STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION
Date: April 24, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: May 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: May 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: May 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 18, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: July 12, 2023STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION Â (Motion #2) *Corrected*
Date: August 25, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: July 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 18, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: June 18, 2023AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH
Date: July 12, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: July 12, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #2)
Date: July 12, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #2)
Date: July 12, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #2)
Date: July 12, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #2)
Date: July 12, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 18, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #2)
Date: July 12, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #2)
Date: July 12, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #2)
Date: July 12, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Â (Motion #2)
Date: July 12, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 25, 2023 |
STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #2) *Corrected* Stipulation of Adjournment of Plaintiff's Motion #002 |
||
July 12, 2023 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
July 12, 2023 | AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH | ||
July 12, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION | ||
July 12, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 5 (Motion #2) Defendant City Response to Case Scheduling Order |
||
July 12, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #2) Defendant City Answer |
||
July 12, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #2) Case Scheduling Order |
||
July 12, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #2) Summons & Complaint |
||
July 12, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 7 (Motion #2) CCRB Final Determination |
||
July 12, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 4 (Motion #2) Compliance Conference Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.