Case Last Refreshed: 23 hours ago
Charlene N. Murray, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Redmond, Cornelius Joseph, against City Of New York, Leroy Dowers, represented by Counsel, Corporation, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts Supreme with KATHERINE LEVINE presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 06, 2019 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Personal Injury) |
Last RefreshedMay 02, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Filing Court HouseSupreme |
EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #3)
Date: April 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #3)
Date: April 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #3)
Date: April 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #3)
Date: March 07, 2024STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #3)
Date: April 22, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #3)
Date: March 07, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #3)
Date: April 22, 2024NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION) Â (Motion #3)
Date: March 07, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #3)
Date: April 22, 2024STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION Â (Motion #3)
Date: April 16, 2024STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #3)
Date: March 07, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #3)
Date: March 07, 2024ORDER - OTHER
Date: November 30, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #3)
Date: March 07, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #3)
Date: March 07, 2024NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #3)
Date: March 07, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #2)
Date: August 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #3)
Date: March 07, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #3)
Date: March 07, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #2)
Date: August 03, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Â (Motion #2)
Date: August 29, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #3)
Date: March 07, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #2)
Date: August 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #3)
Date: March 07, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #2)
Date: August 29, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #2)
Date: August 03, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Â (Motion #2)
Date: August 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #2)
Date: August 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #2)
Date: August 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #2) Verified Bills of Particulars
Date: August 03, 2023RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 14, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: August 03, 2023AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH Â (Motion #2)
Date: August 03, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED ) *Corrected*
Date: May 03, 2022NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY *Corrected*
Date: April 26, 2023ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: June 14, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 14, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: August 03, 2023NOTIFICATION FROM COURT
Date: December 11, 2020PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: April 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 14, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 14, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 14, 2020ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: May 09, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 14, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 14, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 20, 2019SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 06, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 22, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #3) Plaintiff's Verified Bill of Particulars dated Apr 26, 2021 |
||
April 22, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 4 (Motion #3) Defective condition (Enlarged) |
||
April 22, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #3) Defective condition |
||
April 22, 2024 | STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS (Motion #3) | ||
April 22, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #3) Notice of Claim dated Dec 27, 2018 |
||
April 22, 2024 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #3) | ||
April 16, 2024 | STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #3) | ||
March 07, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #3) Notice of Claim |
||
March 07, 2024 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #3) | ||
March 07, 2024 | NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION) (Motion #3) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.