Case Last Refreshed: 1 day ago
Yong Kang Medical Pllc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Glatter, Denise Rubin, Granovsky, Alexander, Harrington, Jennifer Lynn, Pitcoff, Ross Evan, against Dr Li Pediatric Pc, Li Hong Ye, Tszhoderrick Lum, Wellness Family Health Np, P.C., represented by Lucas, Scott A., Pugliese, Steven F., in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts Supreme with Rupert Barry presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 07, 2023 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedMay 02, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSupreme |
ANSWER
Date: September 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: June 28, 2023STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: April 30, 2024STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: April 22, 2024STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: April 01, 2024NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: March 06, 2024STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: January 05, 2024STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: April 11, 2024NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: March 06, 2024STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: March 06, 2024ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S)
Date: December 21, 2023STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: February 01, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 12, 2024NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION / ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 17, 2023REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S)
Date: December 06, 2023ANSWER (AMENDED)
Date: December 12, 2023STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: October 17, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: September 21, 2023SUMMONS (COUNTERCLAIM / CROSSCLAIM - CPLR 3019)
Date: December 21, 2023REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S)
Date: October 16, 2023ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S)
Date: November 15, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: October 02, 2023RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 18, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 18, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 18, 2023COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: June 28, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 18, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1) *Corrected*
Date: September 18, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: June 07, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 07, 2023SUMMONS (PRE RJI) (AMENDED)
Date: July 01, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: July 24, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 29, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 30, 2024 |
STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO REPLY TO DEFENDANT LUMs AMENDED VERIFIED ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIMS |
||
April 22, 2024 |
STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO REPLY TO DEFENDANT LUMs AMENDED VERIFIED ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIMS |
||
April 11, 2024 |
STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO REPLY TO DEFENDANT LUMs AMENDED VERIFIED ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIMS |
||
April 01, 2024 |
STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO REPLY TO DEFENDANT LUMs AMENDED VERIFIED ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIMS |
||
March 06, 2024 |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI) Notice of Appearance - Alex Granovsky |
||
March 06, 2024 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) | ||
March 06, 2024 |
STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO REPLY TO DEFENDANT LUMs AMENDED VERIFIED ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIMS |
||
February 01, 2024 | STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER | ||
January 12, 2024 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
January 05, 2024 | STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.