Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Hussein Badr, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Bonilla, David Alejandro, Elefterakis, Nicholas, Friedman, Taylor Mical, Gluck, Michael, against Adt Security Services Inc., Gelco Fleet Trust, Jean Bouloute, represented by Leybengrub, Abraham David, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts with Francois A Rivera presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFrancois A Rivera Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 30, 2023 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedJanuary 26, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 11, 2024PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: January 24, 2024RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: January 24, 2024RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: January 24, 2024RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: January 24, 2024RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: January 24, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 23, 2023PROOF OF SERVICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 23, 2023PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: October 30, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 23, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 23, 2023PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: January 24, 2024PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: January 24, 2024PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: October 04, 2023RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: October 04, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: May 30, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 13, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: June 20, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 08, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: June 20, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: June 20, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: June 08, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 15, 2023ANSWER
Date: June 20, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 22, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: July 03, 2023PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: June 20, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: June 22, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: June 20, 2023DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: June 20, 2023NOTICE OF DEPOSITION
Date: June 20, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: June 20, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: June 20, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: June 20, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 24, 2024 |
PROOF OF SERVICE Certificate of Service of Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Demand for a Verified Bill of Particul Certificate of Service of Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Demand for a Verified Bill of Particul ... show more |
||
January 24, 2024 |
PROOF OF SERVICE Certificate of Service of Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Demand for Inspection |
||
January 24, 2024 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Combined Demands |
||
January 24, 2024 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Demand for Inspection |
||
January 24, 2024 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Demand for a Verified Bill of Particulars |
||
January 24, 2024 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Notice for Discovery and Inspection |
||
January 24, 2024 |
PROOF OF SERVICE Certificate of Service of Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Combined Demands |
||
January 24, 2024 |
PROOF OF SERVICE Certificate of Service of Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Notice for Discovery and Inspection |
||
January 11, 2024 |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #1) dated 1/11/24 |
||
October 30, 2023 |
PROOF OF SERVICE Certificate of Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.