Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Derek Florimon, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Amato, Ryan John, Bromfeld, Jeffrey Brian, Danayeva, Aigerim, Elefterakis, Nicholas, Ghaznavi, Faizan Ul-Haq, (total of 7) See All against 251 Kane Street, Llc, City Of New York, Elizabeth Forman, Josephine Owen, Marcia Owen, (total of 8) See All represented by , Counsel, Corporation, Feinberg, Michael Colin, Gifford, Robert Winsor, Rocco, Daniel P., (total of 7) See All in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts Kings County Supreme Court with KATHERINE LEVINE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKATHERINE LEVINE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management153 days |
Filing DateJuly 16, 2019 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Premises) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
|
Filing Court HouseKings County Supreme Court |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: February 27, 2020STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: October 07, 2022STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: September 14, 2022STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: October 12, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: February 27, 2020RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: February 27, 2020RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: January 16, 2020RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: January 16, 2020ANSWER
Date: October 25, 2019ANSWER
Date: October 18, 2019DEMAND FOR:
Date: September 17, 2019DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: September 17, 2019ANSWER
Date: September 17, 2019STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: August 28, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 08, 2019SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: July 16, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 12, 2022 |
STIPULATION - OTHER Stipulation Discontinuing Cross-Claims |
||
October 07, 2022 |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance as to Elizabeth Forman |
||
September 14, 2022 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
August 13, 2021 | Hearing |
NOTE OF ISSUE/CITY, NO APPS
Judge: KATHERINE LEVINE, PT. 20 |
|
October 13, 2020 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #001) SUBSEQUENT MOTION PART Judge: CITY DISCOVERY PART 20 |
|
October 13, 2020 | Hearing |
DECIDED (Motion #001) CITY DISCOVERY MOTION Judge: CITY DISCOVERY PART 20 |
|
October 06, 2020 | Hearing |
HELD CITY DISCOVERY COMPLIANCE CONF ADMIN ADJ Judge: KATHERINE LEVINE, PT. 20 |
|
September 22, 2020 | Motion |
STRIKE PLEADINGS (Motion #001) Decided: 10/13/2020GRANTED Before Justice: CITY DISCOVERY PART 20 Answer demanded: Yes Judge: CITY DISCOVERY PART 20 |
|
March 26, 2020 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED FINAL ADR CITY PART 10/6/20 CC Judge: KATHERINE LEVINE, PT. 20 |
|
February 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND Response to P.C. Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.