Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Capytal.Com, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Ainsworth, Levi Yitzchock, against Annette Mumphrey, Mumphrey Transport, Mumphrey Transportation Llc D B A Mumphrey Transportation, represented by Usher, Mikhail, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts with Francois A Rivera presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFrancois A Rivera Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 17, 2023 |
CategoryOther Matters - Contract - Other |
Last RefreshedJanuary 26, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: December 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: December 21, 2023ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 25, 2023SUMMONS WITH NOTICE
Date: May 17, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 31, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: July 24, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 15, 2023AFFIRMATION
Date: July 12, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 22, 2023COMPLAINT
Date: June 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: July 12, 2023PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: May 23, 2023ANSWER
Date: July 07, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 20, 2023PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: May 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: June 20, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 07, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: July 12, 2023DEMAND FOR COMPLAINT
Date: June 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: July 12, 2023RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: July 12, 2023NOTICE TO ADMIT
Date: July 24, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: July 24, 2023DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: July 24, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 21, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Notice to Opposing Counsel |
||
December 21, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Notice to clients |
||
September 25, 2023 |
ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM (Motion #1) dated 9/21/23 |
||
September 22, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
August 15, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
July 31, 2023 |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED (Motion #1) SIGNED OSC |
||
July 31, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
July 24, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Payment History |
||
July 24, 2023 | Notice to Admit | ||
July 24, 2023 |
DEMAND FOR: Demand for Discovery and Inspection |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.