Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Wilmington Savings Fund, Fsb, Not In Its Individually Capacity But Solely As Trustee Of Home Preservation Partnership Trust,, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Nierer, Cynthia Anne, against Emelda Mclennon As Heir And Distributee To The Estate Of Beryl Mclennon, Gordon Wilson As Heir And Distributee To The Estate Of Beryl Mclennon, John Does And Jane Does, Said Names Being Fictitious, Parties Intended Being Possible Tenants Or Occupants Of Premises, And Corporations, Other Entities Or Persons Who Claim, Or May Claim, A Lien Against The Premises, Leon Mclennon As Heir And Distributee To The Estate Of Beryl Mclennon, Monique Wilson As Heir And Distributee To The Estate Of Beryl Mclennon, (total of 10) See All represented by Schwartz, Beth Patricia, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts with Cenceria Edwards presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 10, 2020 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedJuly 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 10, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: August 10, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 10, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: August 10, 2020CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: August 10, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: August 10, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 02, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 02, 2020ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: January 14, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 03, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 02, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 03, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 03, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 02, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: January 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 14, 2022AFFIRMATION
Date: January 14, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 03, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 03, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 03, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 14, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 03, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: August 10, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 17, 2020NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: August 10, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: August 10, 2020NOTICE TO DEFENDANT (PER AO-131-20)
Date: August 10, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 17, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 14, 2022NOTIFICATION FROM COURT
Date: May 16, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 02, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 02, 2020DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: June 23, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 14, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 02, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 03, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 14, 2022RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: January 14, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 05, 2022FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS FORM
Date: November 15, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: July 05, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND CLAIMS TO SURPLUS MONIES
Date: January 19, 2022NOTIFICATION FROM COURT
Date: December 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 08, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: February 08, 2023AFFIRMATION
Date: February 08, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: February 08, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: February 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S)  - c  (Motion #2)
Date: February 08, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: February 23, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 23, 2023 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
February 08, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) noe order of pub |
||
February 08, 2023 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
February 08, 2023 | AFFIRMATION | ||
February 08, 2023 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
February 08, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
February 08, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #2) Proposed Second Supplemental Summons, Second Amended Verified Complaint, Second Amended Notice of Pe Proposed Second Supplemental Summons, Second Amended Verified Complaint, Second Amended Notice of Pe ... show more |
||
February 08, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - c (Motion #2) Certificate |
||
December 14, 2022 | NOTIFICATION FROM COURT | ||
November 15, 2022 | FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS FORM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.