Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Joseph Lampasona, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Suris, Raymond Joseph, against Kayla Miller, Yehuda Miller And, represented by Prezioso, Richard C, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts with Adr-Ias -Noi presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 15, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Negligence- Slip &Amp; Fall) |
Last RefreshedNovember 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 21, 2023NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION
Date: November 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1) Plaintiffs EBT Transcript 3-7-2023 Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 28, 2023STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS
Date: November 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 28, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 21, 2023MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION AND IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION
Date: November 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #1) Yehuda Miller EBT Transcript 6-12-2023 Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 21, 2023STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 28, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION AND IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION
Date: November 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 28, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1) Klepsch EBT Transcript 8-22-2022 Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 28, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 28, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 28, 2023MEMORANDUM
Date: April 27, 2022STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: June 22, 2021NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY
Date: July 11, 2023RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: November 18, 2021ANSWER
Date: July 06, 2021ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: July 27, 2022MEMORANDUM
Date: March 24, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: March 01, 2022MEMORANDUM
Date: February 22, 2022MEMORANDUM
Date: December 28, 2021NOTICE OF DEPOSITION/SUBPOENA
Date: November 30, 2021MEMORANDUM
Date: November 03, 2021NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: November 24, 2021BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: March 01, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND Response to Plaintiff's Combined Demands Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: March 01, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: January 12, 2022ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: December 10, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: June 17, 2021MEMORANDUM
Date: August 06, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 21, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #2) PLAINTIFF'S AFFIDAVIT |
||
November 21, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #2) PLAINTIFF'S EBT |
||
November 21, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #2) DEFENDANT'S EBT |
||
November 21, 2023 | NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION | ||
November 21, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #2) NON-PARTY EBT |
||
November 21, 2023 | STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS | ||
November 21, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
November 21, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) S&C |
||
November 21, 2023 | MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION AND IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION | ||
November 21, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #2) PHOTOS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.