Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Jael Tusa Quinga, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Bellin, Eugene Mark, against Britneytusa Quinga As Administrator Of The Estate Of Leonel G Tusa Masaquiza, Deceased, Ftl 1001, Llc, Paudy A. Nunez-Arias, Rigo Limo-Auto Corp., The Estate Of Leonel G Tusa Masaquiza, Deceased, (total of 5) See All represented by Hellreich, Steven Mark, Lachman, Michael, Moskovits, Ronit Z, Weber, Andrew Nelson, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts with Robin Sheares presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobin Sheares Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 14, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedOctober 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 14, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 01, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 23, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: September 01, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 01, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 01, 2021ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: July 20, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 20, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 24, 2021SUMMONS - SUPPLEMENTAL (PRE RJI)
Date: August 06, 2021ANSWER (AMENDED)
Date: August 25, 2021PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: September 29, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #2)
Date: September 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #2)
Date: September 02, 2021ORDER - JOINT TRIAL
Date: February 10, 2022COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: August 06, 2021ANSWER
Date: August 26, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 19, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 26, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: January 12, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #3)
Date: August 08, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: January 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #3)
Date: July 21, 2022ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: February 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: May 06, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: May 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: May 06, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: May 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #3)
Date: August 08, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY/COPY OF ENTERED ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: June 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: May 06, 2022AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH
Date: July 21, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: July 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 01, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: September 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #3)
Date: August 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #3)
Date: July 21, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 01, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #3)
Date: July 21, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: September 02, 2021RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: September 01, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #2)
Date: September 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2)
Date: September 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #3)
Date: August 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #3)
Date: August 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #3)
Date: August 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #3)
Date: August 08, 2022ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: August 25, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: July 21, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: August 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #3)
Date: August 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #3)
Date: August 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #3)
Date: August 08, 2022ORDER - OTHER Â (Motion #3)
Date: August 12, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #3)
Date: August 08, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: August 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #3)
Date: August 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #3)
Date: August 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 01, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 21, 2023 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
September 21, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION | ||
September 21, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #5) Note of Issue |
||
September 21, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #5) Summons and Complaint |
||
September 21, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #5) Order |
||
September 21, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #5) Bill of Particulars Bill of Particulars Possible SSN Administratively Redacted |
||
September 21, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #5) Answer |
||
September 21, 2023 | AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH | ||
September 15, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #4) Defendant's Deposition |
||
September 15, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #4) Plaintiff's Deposition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.