Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
As Guardian For Erhan Bek, An Incapacitated Person And, Ertan Bek, Ertan Bek, As Proposed Administrator Of The Estate Of Erhan Bek,, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Pagan, Tania M., against Coney Island Hospital, New York City Health And Hospitals Corporation, represented by Zamyatin, Irina, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts with Pamela L Fisher presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 16, 2022 |
CategoryTorts - Medical, Dental, Or Podiatrist Malpractice |
Last RefreshedJuly 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: May 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: May 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: May 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F
Date: May 16, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: July 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: May 16, 2022RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: May 16, 2022ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM
Date: June 30, 2022NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI)
Date: July 12, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED Â (Motion #1)
Date: May 24, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 16, 2022PETITION
Date: May 16, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: May 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: May 16, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 12, 2022 | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI) | ||
July 07, 2022 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
June 30, 2022 | ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM | ||
June 16, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavits of Service of Order to Show Cause (3) |
||
May 24, 2022 |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED (Motion #1) SIGNED OSC |
||
May 16, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C Exhibit C - 50 H Transcript |
||
May 16, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Exhibit A - Notice of Claim |
||
May 16, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E Exhibit E - Death Certificate |
||
May 16, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - F Exhibit F - Amended Notice of Claim |
||
May 16, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D Exhibit D - Commission Appointing Guardian |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.