Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Harry Pfeffer, Judy Pfeffer, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Weiss, Robert, against Play Pattern Llc, Ronah Harris, represented by Carcagno, Joseph John, Simon, John Zachary, in the jurisdiction of Kings County, NY, . Kings County, NY Superior Courts with Richard Velasquez presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 11, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedJuly 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 11, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 03, 2021RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: November 10, 2021STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: August 15, 2022ANSWER
Date: September 03, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: April 25, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: December 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 02, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO CROSS-MOTION
Date: April 25, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 13, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 13, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 19, 2022NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 19, 2022STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: March 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 02, 2021STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS
Date: December 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 19, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 19, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 19, 2022CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: April 20, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 15, 2022 |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance |
||
April 25, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY | ||
April 25, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO CROSS-MOTION | ||
April 20, 2022 |
CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI) Consent to Change Attorney |
||
April 19, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #2) Exhibit C - Proposed Amended Answer |
||
April 19, 2022 |
NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION (Motion #2) Notice of Cross-Motion to Amend the Answer and Dismiss |
||
April 19, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) Exhibit A - Summons & Complaint |
||
April 19, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION (Motion #2) Affirmation in Support |
||
April 19, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #2) Exhibit B - Answer |
||
April 19, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #1) Affirmation in Opposition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.