Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Td Auto Finance, Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Cano, Pilar A, Cordova, Anastasia Poushkareva, Shur, Joseph M, against Jahqueena Haynes A K A Haynes Jahqueena, represented by Schedler, Matthew Austin, Young, Naomi Mo Chee, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts Kings County Supreme Court with Wayne Saitta presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJuly 09, 2018 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions86 days |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
|
Filing Court HouseKings County Supreme Court |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED Â (Motion #1) *Corrected*
Date: April 03, 2019STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: February 26, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: July 12, 2019STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 10, 2020RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: March 27, 2019SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: July 09, 2018STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: August 15, 2019ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: March 27, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: December 10, 2019STIPULATION - CONFIDENTIALITY ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: December 10, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: May 08, 2019ANSWER IN SPECIAL PROCEEDING
Date: March 27, 2019ANSWER
Date: September 26, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: November 07, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 04, 2020JUDGMENT
Date: October 03, 2018STIPULATION - CONFIDENTIALITY ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: November 07, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: April 22, 2019MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: June 04, 2020ORDER - OTHER Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 09, 2019ORDER - OTHER
Date: April 25, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: July 09, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Deficiency statement and payment history Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: July 09, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: March 27, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 03, 2018AFFIRMATION
Date: March 27, 2019AFFIDAVIT
Date: October 03, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: March 27, 2019AFFIDAVIT
Date: March 27, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 22, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 22, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1) Demand Letter Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: April 22, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 22, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: March 27, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - H
Date: March 27, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 19, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Department of Consumer Affairs Consent Order Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: March 27, 2019JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: October 03, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: March 27, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 22, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 22, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 22, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #1) Default Judgment Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: April 22, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #1) Repossession Invoice Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: April 22, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - G
Date: March 27, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 23, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - J
Date: March 27, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - K
Date: March 27, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - I
Date: March 27, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1) Summons and Complaint Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: April 22, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: May 08, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 22, 2019NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)
Date: March 27, 2019NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: August 15, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 04, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 04, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 04, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 08, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 04, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 04, 2020TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS - CERTIFIED
Date: September 05, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 12, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 04, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 04, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 04, 2020NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION) Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 04, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #2)
Date: September 02, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #2)
Date: September 02, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: September 02, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #2)
Date: September 02, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 04, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 04, 2020STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF HEARING
Date: September 08, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #2)
Date: September 02, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #2)
Date: September 02, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #2)
Date: September 02, 2020CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (PRE RJI)
Date: June 24, 2020NOTIFICATION FROM COURT
Date: December 11, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2)
Date: September 02, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #2) *Corrected*
Date: September 02, 2020NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: September 08, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #2)
Date: September 02, 2020CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: June 24, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 04, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #2)
Date: September 02, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #2)
Date: September 02, 2020MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY
Date: October 29, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 04, 2020ORDER - OTHER
Date: November 06, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #2)
Date: September 02, 2020DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 25, 2021STIPULATION - SO ORDERED Â (Motion #2)
Date: September 11, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #2)
Date: September 02, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2)
Date: September 02, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #2)
Date: September 02, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #2)
Date: September 02, 2020STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: August 09, 2021STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) *Corrected*
Date: May 19, 2021STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: November 04, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 09, 2021 |
STIPULATION - SO ORDERED Dated 6/24/21 |
||
May 19, 2021 |
STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) *Corrected* Stipulation of Dismissal |
||
February 25, 2021 |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #2) dated 2/16/21 |
||
February 03, 2021 | Hearing |
(Motion #002) Motion Oral Argument, Part 34 Judge: Genovesi, Hon. Lara J. |
|
December 11, 2020 |
NOTIFICATION FROM COURT Re: Kings County Supreme Civil Court Mediation Program |
||
November 06, 2020 |
ORDER - OTHER dated 11/4/2020 |
||
November 04, 2020 |
STIPULATION - OTHER Requesting an Oral Argument |
||
November 04, 2020 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #002) Motion Trial Term 34 Judge: Genovesi, Hon. Lara J. |
|
October 29, 2020 | MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY | ||
September 11, 2020 |
STIPULATION - SO ORDERED (Motion #2) dated 9/9/20 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.