Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
The City Of New York, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Quhshi, Mohamed D., against 1005 46Th Street Llc, Jane Doe, John Doe, The Land And Building Known As 1005 East 46Th Street, Tax Block #5023, Tax Lot #60, County Of Kings, City And State Of New York, represented by Minsley, Morton S, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts with Kings Cdp7 presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 05, 2023 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Nuisance Abatement) |
Last RefreshedJanuary 26, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: January 23, 2024NOTICE OF APPEAL/INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: July 12, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 12, 2023AFFIRMATION
Date: May 05, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) *Corrected*
Date: May 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: May 05, 2023AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH *Corrected*
Date: May 05, 2023RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: May 05, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: May 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: May 05, 2023ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A)
Date: May 05, 2023NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)
Date: May 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 06, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 06, 2023ANSWER
Date: June 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 06, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED Â (Motion #1)
Date: May 08, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: May 12, 2023CERTIFICATION OF SIGNATURE ( ATTORNEY OR PARTY ) Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 06, 2023ORDER - OTHER
Date: June 16, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 23, 2024 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
July 12, 2023 | NOTICE OF APPEAL/INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE | ||
July 12, 2023 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1) Notice of Entry, Order Entered June 21, 2023 |
||
June 16, 2023 |
ORDER - OTHER granting preliminary injunction |
||
June 06, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Department of State Filings |
||
June 06, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Signed Lease |
||
June 06, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) Sample Contract |
||
June 06, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) Photos of Space |
||
June 06, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #1) Affidavit in Opposition to Motion |
||
June 06, 2023 |
ANSWER Verified Answer to Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.