Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Kean V Mitchell, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Linder, Mark, against Emmanuel Bisono, Nancy Antonia Bisono, represented by Mamounis, Nicholas P, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts Kings County Supreme Court with Johnny Lee Baynes presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management112 days |
|
Filing DateJune 10, 2019 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseKings County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time214 days |
ANSWER
Date: July 15, 2019SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 10, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: June 10, 2019STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: March 16, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance |
|
January 10, 2020 | Hearing |
OTHER SETTLEMENT PRE-NOTE FINAL ADR PART 1/24/20 CCP Judge: JOHNNY LEE BAYNES |
|
November 18, 2019 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED GENERAL-ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE 1/24/20 CCP Judge: JOHNNY LEE BAYNES |
|
October 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Order Dated 09/30/2019 |
|
September 30, 2019 | Hearing |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE HELD INTAKE PART Judge: PAUL WOOTEN |
|
September 03, 2019 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | |
July 24, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
July 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
ANSWER ANS with Demands |
|
June 20, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
June 17, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.