Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Sanmi Ojo, filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case represented by Bernstein, Adam S, Budin, Harlan S, Mcmahon, Gregory C, against Atlantic Ave Fuel Corp.,, Manny Enterprises Llc,, Morvary Llc And, M & V Llc, Shell Gas Station,, (total of 5) See All represented by Besen, Stuart Paul, Gifford, Robert Winsor, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts Kings County Supreme Court with Wayne Saitta presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWayne Saitta Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJuly 18, 2016 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Negligence) |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
|
Filing Court HouseKings County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time834 days |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)
Date: August 18, 2017STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: April 25, 2017DEMAND FOR:
Date: March 02, 2017STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: January 24, 2017ORDER - OTHER
Date: September 19, 2018STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 18, 2016STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: October 24, 2018STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: October 30, 2017STIPULATION - WITHDRAWING MOTION/ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #1)
Date: October 25, 2017RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)
Date: August 18, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1)
Date: August 18, 2017DEMAND FOR:
Date: June 14, 2017DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: June 14, 2017ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: April 25, 2017DEMAND FOR:
Date: March 02, 2017ANSWER
Date: March 02, 2017SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: July 18, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 30, 2018 | Hearing |
DISCONTINUED, FEE PAID 10-24-18 (Conversion) Conference Part 29 Judge: Saitta, Hon. Wayne P. |
|
October 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance |
|
September 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY Note of Issue |
|
September 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
ORDER - OTHER dated 9/17/18 |
|
September 17, 2018 | Hearing |
Held NOTE OF ISSUE-FINAL CONFERENCE PART Supreme Trial (Conversion) Judge: Saitta, Hon. Wayne P. |
|
May 14, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE | |
May 08, 2018 | Hearing |
Held CENTRAL COMPLIANCE PART Supreme Trial (Conversion) Judge: Saitta, Hon. Wayne P. |
|
January 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE DTD 12/11/2017 |
|
December 11, 2017 | Hearing |
Held INTAKE PART Supreme Initial (first time on) (Conversion) Judge: Graham, Hon. Bernard J. |
|
October 30, 2017 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance without Prejudice in favor of defendants Morvary LLC and M&V LLC only |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.