Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Kasey Harge, filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case represented by Rouff, Myeisha Andrea, against The City Of New York, The City Of New York Department Of Correction, represented by Counsel, Corporation, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts with Kings Cdp7 presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 12, 2020 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Gross Negligence) |
Last RefreshedNovember 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: July 12, 2020BILL OF PARTICULARS Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: June 01, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 14, 2023ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: June 13, 2023RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: January 30, 2023ANSWER
Date: May 23, 2022CONSENT TO EFILING
Date: December 02, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 13, 2023 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
June 01, 2023 |
BILL OF PARTICULARS Redacted per 22 NYCRR Redacted per 22 NYCRR §202.5(e) |
||
April 14, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
January 30, 2023 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
May 23, 2022 | ANSWER | ||
December 02, 2020 | CONSENT TO EFILING | ||
July 12, 2020 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.