Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Maria Urena, filed a(n) Discrimination - Labor and Employment case represented by Lefkowitz, Jared M, against Jp Morgan Chase, Melissa Mathey, Sherri Fitzgerald, William Berdini, William Li, (total of 5) See All represented by Bernstein, Daniel Martin, Collins, Patrick M, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts Kings County Supreme Court with Larry D presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLarry D Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJune 30, 2016 |
CategoryCommercial - Other (Employment Discrimination) |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
|
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeDiscrimination |
|
Filing Court HouseKings County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time1090 days |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW (Motion #2)
Date: July 07, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #11)
Date: August 08, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #11)
Date: November 13, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #11)
Date: August 08, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #11)
Date: November 06, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #9)
Date: April 30, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #11)
Date: August 08, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #10)
Date: July 17, 2018NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #10)
Date: July 17, 2018STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: May 08, 2019MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #10)
Date: July 17, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION (Motion #8)
Date: April 30, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #9)
Date: August 06, 2018NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #9)
Date: April 30, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #9)
Date: July 30, 2018ORDER - OTHER
Date: September 25, 2017ORDER - OTHER
Date: August 24, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #2)
Date: July 24, 2017ORDER - OTHER
Date: March 20, 2018ORDER - OTHER
Date: March 30, 2018ORDER - OTHER
Date: August 25, 2017ORDER - OTHER
Date: February 07, 2018NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #7)
Date: February 26, 2018STIPULATION - WITHDRAWING MOTION/ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #4)
Date: January 29, 2018STIPULATION - WITHDRAWING MOTION/ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #3)
Date: January 29, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION AND IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION (Motion #5)
Date: December 26, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #5)
Date: December 14, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #3)
Date: October 25, 2017ANSWER
Date: September 25, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #2)
Date: September 11, 2017COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: September 05, 2017INTERROGATORIES
Date: August 31, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) (Motion #1)
Date: July 31, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) (Motion #2)
Date: July 14, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #2)
Date: July 07, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #1)
Date: June 23, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)
Date: June 23, 2017ANSWER
Date: August 15, 2016SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 30, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 25, 2019 | Hearing |
Withdrawn (Motion #0011) Motion Trial Term 41 DISC (Conversion) Judge: Martin, Hon. Larry D. |
|
June 25, 2019 | Hearing |
Withdrawn (Motion #0010) Motion Trial Term 41 DISC (Conversion) Judge: Martin, Hon. Larry D. |
|
May 22, 2019 | Hearing |
Discontinued JURY COORDINATING PART 1 STD DTD 3/26/19 (Conversion) Judge: Jury Coordinating Part, |
|
May 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) with Prejudice |
|
March 26, 2019 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #0011) Motion Trial Term 41 CONTRL (Conversion) Judge: Martin, Hon. Larry D. |
|
March 26, 2019 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #0010) Motion Trial Term 41 Judge: Martin, Hon. Larry D. |
|
February 26, 2019 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #0011) Motion Trial Term 41 CONTRL (Conversion) Judge: Martin, Hon. Larry D. |
|
November 13, 2018 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #11) | |
November 13, 2018 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #0011) Motion Trial Term 41 Judge: Martin, Hon. Larry D. |
|
November 13, 2018 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #0010) Motion Trial Term 41 Judge: Martin, Hon. Larry D. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.