Case Last Refreshed: 15 hours ago
Nicholas Grant, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Barenbaum, Bryan, against 147-02 12 Liberty Ave., Llc., Isaac Rios Jr, Jouvay Ny, Inc., Jouvay Ny, Inc. D B A Jouvay Night Club, Professional Corporate Security Services, Inc., (total of 5) See All represented by Bieder, John William, Chiaramonte, Cassandra Lyn, Crane, Christine Marie, Enright, Michelle Ann, Mitchell, William J, (total of 10) See All in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts Supreme with Wayne Saitta presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWayne Saitta Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 10, 2019 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedApril 29, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSupreme |
This complaint is a legal document filed in the Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Kings. The plaintiff, Nicholas Grant, is suing defendants 147-02/12 Liberty Ave., LLC, Jouvay NY, Inc., and Isaac J. Rios. The complaint alleges that th...
DEMAND FOR:
Date: January 10, 2024DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #4)
Date: September 27, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY/COPY OF ENTERED ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE Â (Motion #4)
Date: October 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #5)
Date: September 12, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY/COPY OF ENTERED ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE Â (Motion #3)
Date: September 12, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #5)
Date: September 12, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #5)
Date: September 12, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #4)
Date: July 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #5)
Date: September 12, 2023ORDER - CONSOLIDATION Â (Motion #3)
Date: September 06, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY/COPY OF ENTERED ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: September 12, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #4)
Date: July 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #4)
Date: September 12, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #5)
Date: September 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #4)
Date: September 12, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #4)
Date: July 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #4)
Date: September 12, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #5)
Date: September 05, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #4)
Date: September 12, 2023NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #5)
Date: September 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #4)
Date: July 31, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #4)
Date: September 12, 2023AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH Â (Motion #5)
Date: September 05, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #4)
Date: July 31, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #3)
Date: September 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #4)
Date: July 31, 2023AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH Â (Motion #4)
Date: July 31, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #4) *Corrected*
Date: July 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #4)
Date: July 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #3)
Date: July 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #3)
Date: July 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #3)
Date: July 20, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #3)
Date: July 20, 2023AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #3)
Date: July 20, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #3)
Date: July 20, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #3)
Date: July 20, 2023NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION / ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #2)
Date: January 31, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 26, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: January 26, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #2)
Date: January 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2)
Date: January 25, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: January 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #2)
Date: December 29, 2022AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH Â (Motion #2)
Date: December 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #2)
Date: December 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #2)
Date: December 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #2)
Date: December 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #2)
Date: December 29, 2022ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: June 08, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY/COPY OF ENTERED ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: December 22, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: October 07, 2021PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: May 02, 2022NOTIFICATION FROM COURT
Date: December 11, 2020DEMAND FOR:
Date: May 02, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: May 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: October 07, 2021ORDER - EXPARTE
Date: December 04, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - G
Date: October 07, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F
Date: October 07, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: October 07, 2021RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION
Date: August 26, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: October 07, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: October 07, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: October 07, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: August 26, 2020EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: August 26, 2020REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S)
Date: September 23, 2021EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: October 07, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: August 26, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 19, 2019REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S)
Date: September 23, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: August 26, 2020DEMAND FOR:
Date: September 23, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 19, 2019DEMAND FOR:
Date: August 30, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: August 26, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: June 10, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 10, 2019SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: May 10, 2019ORDER - OTHER Â (Motion #6)
Date: April 16, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 11, 2024RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: April 11, 2024AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH Â (Motion #6)
Date: March 12, 2024NOTICE OF DEPOSITION
Date: March 18, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #6)
Date: March 12, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #6)
Date: March 12, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #6)
Date: March 12, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #6)
Date: March 12, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #6)
Date: March 12, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 10, 2024NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #6)
Date: March 12, 2024DEMAND FOR:
Date: August 30, 2021DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: August 30, 2021ANSWER
Date: August 30, 2021DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: July 30, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 03, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 01, 2021ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: June 01, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: May 26, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: May 26, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: May 26, 2021DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: May 26, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: May 26, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: May 26, 2021ANSWER
Date: May 26, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #2)
Date: December 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G
Date: November 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #2)
Date: December 29, 2022STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: May 11, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #2)
Date: December 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F
Date: November 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #2)
Date: December 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2)
Date: December 29, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 10, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: November 02, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #2)
Date: December 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: November 02, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: December 29, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 22, 2021ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: December 06, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: December 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Discovery response
Date: November 02, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: November 02, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: December 15, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 22, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - I
Date: November 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: November 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H
Date: November 02, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 22, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: November 02, 2022COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: December 22, 2020RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: July 20, 2022SUMMONS-SUPPLEMENTAL (POST RJI)
Date: December 22, 2020STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION Â (Motion #6)
Date: April 04, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 16, 2024 |
ORDER - OTHER (Motion #6) DTD 04/10/2024 |
||
April 11, 2024 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
April 11, 2024 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND Supplement Response |
||
April 04, 2024 |
STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #6) Stipulation to Adjourn Motion (Mtn #006) |
||
March 18, 2024 |
NOTICE OF DEPOSITION Notice of Availability of Party Witness - Jarrad Seuferling - PCSS Inc. |
||
March 12, 2024 | AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH (Motion #6) | ||
March 12, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #6) PCSS's Answer |
||
March 12, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #6) Plaintiff's Supplemental Summons and Amended Complaint |
||
March 12, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #6) Jouvay's Answer |
||
March 12, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #6) 147-02's Answer |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.