Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Bayview Loan Servicing, Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Grigg, Natalie Ann, against City Of New York Environmental Control Board, John Doe, Levi Eichenstein, Miriam Eichenstein, represented by Hoschander, Abraham, in the jurisdiction of Kings County, NY, . Kings County, NY Superior Courts Kings County Supreme Court with David B presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid B Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateAugust 24, 2015 |
CategoryForeclosure (Residential Mortgage) |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Filing Court HouseKings County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time1018 days |
ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S)
Date: October 04, 2015NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)
Date: January 16, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1)
Date: January 16, 2018ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1)
Date: January 16, 2018SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 24, 2015STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 08, 2015STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 10, 2015STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 08, 2015ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: March 22, 2018STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 11, 2015REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S)
Date: October 08, 2015ORDER - OTHER
Date: June 05, 2017STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 24, 2015STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 09, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1) Filed by DKS 20151492 |
|
March 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY dtd 3/7/18 |
|
March 07, 2018 | Hearing |
Fully Submitted (Motion #001) For. Resolution Part1-Motion Judge: Dear, Hon. Noach |
|
January 17, 2018 | Motion |
Discontinue (Motion #001) Decided: 03/07/2018Closed Before Justice: Dear, Hon. Noach Answer demanded: Yes Judge: Dear, Hon. Noach |
|
January 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) Filed by JPV - 20151492 |
|
January 16, 2018 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1) | |
January 16, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1) | |
January 16, 2018 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) | |
December 11, 2017 | Hearing |
Held Foreclosure Resolution PT 1 Supreme Trial; NAD-REL (Conversion) Judge: Dear, Hon. Noach |
|
September 26, 2017 | Hearing |
Adjourned Foreclosure Resolution PT 1 FINAL (Conversion) Judge: Dear, Hon. Noach |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.