Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
D. A.C. An Infant By Her Mother And Natural Guardian, Dalisha Adams, Dalisha Adams Individually, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Glugeth, Jared Craig, Levine, Andrew J, Rizzo, Frank Mario, against Portier, Llc, Raiser, Llc, Uber Eats, Uber Technologies, Inc., Uber Usa, (total of 6) See All represented by Cushmaro, Tal Zev, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts with Karen B Rothenberg presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 28, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: April 28, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 03, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 10, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: May 03, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 10, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 12, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: June 11, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 01, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 03, 2021ANSWER
Date: July 23, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 18, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: March 29, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 03, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 10, 2021ANSWER
Date: June 01, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 29, 2022STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION
Date: August 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 29, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 22, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 29, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: June 24, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3
Date: June 11, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 29, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: March 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 29, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: June 11, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 29, 2022RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: March 29, 2022STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION
Date: September 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 14, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: September 14, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: November 03, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 14, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: January 13, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: January 18, 2023ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: March 30, 2023ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: May 30, 2023ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: September 21, 2023PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: April 26, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 21, 2023 | ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE | ||
May 30, 2023 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
April 26, 2023 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST | ||
March 30, 2023 | ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) | ||
January 18, 2023 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
January 13, 2023 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
November 03, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY | ||
September 21, 2022 | STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION | ||
September 14, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) Exhibit E - Affidavit of Todd Gaddis |
||
September 14, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Exhibit B - Affidavit of D.A.C. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.