Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Crepini Llc, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Hamilton, Sherry S., Mcpartland, Patrick T, against Boris Tulman, Cooltech Mechanical Corp., Cooltech Mechanical Group, Inc., Eugene Tulman, Mikhail Tulman, (total of 9) See All represented by Darwin, David Lee, Muchmore, Andrew M, Travis, Maximilian Douglas, Young, Hayes, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts Kings County Supreme Court with Larry D presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLarry D Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateAugust 06, 2015 |
CategoryCommercial Division |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
|
Filing Court HouseKings County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time1567 days |
ANSWER (AMENDED)
Date: September 14, 2015STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: March 25, 2016EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: April 04, 2016MEMORANDUM OF LAW Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 02, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: April 04, 2016REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S)
Date: April 05, 2017ANSWER (AMENDED)
Date: February 22, 2017SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 06, 2015ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: September 10, 2015NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: September 19, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: September 19, 2017ANSWER
Date: September 21, 2015COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: December 16, 2016EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: November 24, 2015ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S)
Date: October 26, 2015NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: February 17, 2016NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: December 02, 2015ANSWER (AMENDED)
Date: March 09, 2017STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: November 14, 2019STIPULATION - WITHDRAWING MOTION/ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: February 27, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: April 04, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: April 04, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 02, 2015AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 02, 2015AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 25, 2015AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 14, 2015AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 09, 2015AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 25, 2015EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 02, 2015EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 02, 2015AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 10, 2015EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: April 04, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: April 04, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - F
Date: April 04, 2016PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: October 07, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: November 24, 2015EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 02, 2015NOTICE OF DEPOSITION
Date: October 26, 2015EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: November 24, 2015EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: November 24, 2015EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: November 24, 2015AFFIRMATION
Date: December 02, 2015EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: November 24, 2015EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 02, 2015RJI -RE: OTHER(SPECIFY IN DESCRIPTION AREA) *Corrected*
Date: September 30, 2015EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 02, 2015EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 02, 2015EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 02, 2015EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 02, 2015EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 02, 2015EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 02, 2015EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #2)
Date: September 19, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #2)
Date: September 19, 2017NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY
Date: August 30, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #2)
Date: September 19, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #2)
Date: September 19, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2)
Date: September 19, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #2)
Date: September 19, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #2)
Date: September 19, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #2)
Date: September 19, 2017NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION
Date: February 17, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #2)
Date: September 19, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #2)
Date: September 19, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #2)
Date: September 19, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #2)
Date: September 19, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #2)
Date: September 19, 2017STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE
Date: December 06, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #2)
Date: September 19, 2017AFFIDAVIT
Date: December 02, 2015EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: April 04, 2016ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: November 17, 2016ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: March 03, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 05, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 31, 2017STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: May 31, 2019ORDER - OTHER
Date: September 11, 2019REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S)
Date: November 09, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: November 24, 2015REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S)
Date: November 25, 2015STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: September 17, 2015STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 02, 2015ORDER - OTHER
Date: March 02, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 20, 2019 | Hearing |
Discontinued Commercial Part Conf 12 2:30PM (Conversion) Judge: Martin, Hon. Larry D. |
|
November 14, 2019 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | |
September 11, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER - OTHER | |
August 16, 2019 | Hearing |
Adjourned COMMERCIAL PART 11 PRE-TRI 10AM (Conversion) Judge: Ash, Hon. Sylvia G. |
|
July 26, 2019 | Hearing |
Adjourned COMMERCIAL PART 11 PRE-TRI (Conversion) Judge: Ash, Hon. Sylvia G. |
|
May 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - SO ORDERED (confidentiality) dtd 5/28/2019 |
|
May 17, 2019 | Hearing |
Adjourned COMMERCIAL PART 11 PRE-TRI (Conversion) Judge: Ash, Hon. Sylvia G. |
|
March 28, 2019 | Hearing |
Adjourned COMMERCIAL PART 11 PRE-TRIAL (Conversion) Judge: Ash, Hon. Sylvia G. |
|
November 01, 2018 | Hearing |
Referred COMMERCIAL PART 11 SC (Conversion) Judge: Ash, Hon. Sylvia G. |
|
August 14, 2018 | Hearing |
Held COMMERCIAL PART 11 Supreme Trial; SC (Conversion) Judge: Ash, Hon. Sylvia G. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.