Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Kathleen Santucci, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Levitz, Lonny R, Levitz, Lonny Roy, against Enrico Doria, represented by Pinczower, Kenneth E., in the jurisdiction of Kings County, NY, . Kings County, NY Superior Courts with Martin M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMartin M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 06, 2015 |
CategoryTort |
Last RefreshedJuly 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Case Cycle Time400 days |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 06, 2015STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 06, 2015STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 04, 2015ANSWER
Date: November 11, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 09, 2016 | Hearing |
Settled - Other CENTRAL COMPLIANCE PART Judge: Solomon, Hon. Martin M. |
|
January 19, 2016 |
ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE dtd 1/14/16, filed cc 1/19/16 |
||
January 14, 2016 | Hearing |
Held INTAKE PART Supreme Initial (first time on) (Conversion) Judge: Solomon, Hon. Martin M. |
|
December 04, 2015 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
December 04, 2015 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
December 04, 2015 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST | ||
November 11, 2015 | ANSWER | ||
August 27, 2015 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
August 06, 2015 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT | ||
August 06, 2015 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.