Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Shalear Graham, filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case represented by Prisco, Michael J., against Nycha Public Housing Preservation I, Llc, The New York City Housing Authority, represented by Bass, Deborah A, Dellaratta, Maria, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts with Jury Coordinating Part 1 presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 17, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (General Liability) |
Last RefreshedOctober 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: May 17, 2021RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: May 17, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: May 17, 2021RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: May 17, 2021ANSWER
Date: May 04, 2021DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: May 04, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: August 31, 2021ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: January 21, 2022TRIAL DOCUMENTS
Date: October 21, 2021ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: January 17, 2022TRIAL DOCUMENTS
Date: February 01, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 30, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 30, 2021ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: June 28, 2021SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: April 17, 2021CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: August 31, 2021TRIAL DOCUMENTS
Date: November 05, 2021TRIAL DOCUMENTS
Date: November 05, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: November 05, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: November 12, 2021RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: March 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: March 29, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 04, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: April 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 04, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 02, 2022STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 02, 2022CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: September 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 04, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 04, 2022NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY
Date: April 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 04, 2022RESPONSE TO STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 22, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: September 14, 2022STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS
Date: April 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 04, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 04, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 02, 2022TRIAL DOCUMENTS
Date: April 04, 2022NOTICE OF APPEAL/INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: September 16, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 22, 2022TRIAL DOCUMENTS
Date: April 04, 2022BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: December 01, 2022TRIAL DOCUMENTS
Date: December 01, 2022TRIAL DOCUMENTS
Date: December 01, 2022TRIAL DOCUMENTS
Date: December 01, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 07, 2022NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI)
Date: December 23, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: January 11, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 11, 2023 |
DEMAND FOR: demand for trial authorizations |
||
December 23, 2022 |
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI) Notice of Change of Firm Post RJI |
||
December 07, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Lenox Hill Radiology |
||
December 01, 2022 |
BILL OF PARTICULARS December 1, 2022 Supplemental Bill of Particulars |
||
December 01, 2022 |
TRIAL DOCUMENTS Subpoena New York Spine |
||
December 01, 2022 |
TRIAL DOCUMENTS Subpoena Lenox Hill Radiology |
||
December 01, 2022 |
TRIAL DOCUMENTS Subpoena DHD Medical |
||
September 16, 2022 | NOTICE OF APPEAL/INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE | ||
September 14, 2022 |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #1) DATED 9/1/22 |
||
September 14, 2022 | NOTICE OF ENTRY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.