Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Jennifer Lyte As Proposed Administrator Of The Estate Of Edward Chase, Deceased, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Rosenthal, Fred Robert, Zaransky, Michael Bruce, against Kingsbrook Jewish Medical Center, represented by Adams, Martin B, Luckie, Janine, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts Kings County Supreme Court with Laura Lee Jacobson (Pt.21) presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJuly 13, 2015 |
CategoryTort |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseKings County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time261 days |
ANSWER
Date: November 18, 2015STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #1)
Date: December 15, 2015STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 12, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #1)
Date: March 03, 2016ORDER - OTHER
Date: March 29, 2016STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 05, 2015RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)
Date: December 15, 2015NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)
Date: December 15, 2015SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: July 13, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 30, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1) Order with Notice of Entry |
|
March 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
ORDER - OTHER dated 3/14/16 |
|
March 08, 2016 | Hearing |
Fully Submitted (Motion #001) Motion Trial Term 21 Judge: Jacobson, Hon. Laura Lee |
|
March 03, 2016 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #1) REPLY AFFIRMATION |
|
January 12, 2016 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #001) Motion Trial Term 21 Judge: Jacobson, Hon. Laura Lee |
|
December 15, 2015 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #1) | |
December 15, 2015 | Motion |
Dismiss (Motion #001) Decided: 03/14/2016Closed Before Justice: Jacobson, Hon. Laura Lee Answer demanded: Yes Judge: Jacobson, Hon. Laura Lee |
|
December 15, 2015 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) | |
December 15, 2015 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) | |
December 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) NOTICE FOR DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.