Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
The Bank Of New York Mellon F K A The Bank Of New Youk As Indenture Trustee On Behalf Of The Noteholders And The Note Insurer Of Abfs Mortgage Loan Trust 2000-4,, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Biffar, Shane Matthew, Boriskin, Sara Z., Mansoor, Dustin Peter, Muratore, Jacqueline Marie, against Beniah Anokam, Charles Anokam, Fati Obogulo, John Doe "John Doe # 6 Through John Doe # 12, " The Last Seven Names Being Fictitious And Unknown To Plaintiff, The Persons Or Parties Intended Being The Tenants, Occupants, Persons Or Corporations, If Any, Having Or Claiming An Interest In Or Lien Upon The Premi, May Anokam, (total of 11) See All represented by Bachrach, Jonathan D, Yitzhak, Erica Tobi, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts Kings County Supreme Court with Cenceria Edwards presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCenceria Edwards Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 08, 2015 |
CategoryForeclosure (Residential Mortgage) |
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseKings County Supreme Court |
REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S)
Date: March 01, 2016STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 13, 2015STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 23, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 29, 2017ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S)
Date: November 19, 2015LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: April 25, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 24, 2018ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 29, 2017SUMMONS + COMPLAINT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT.pdf Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: July 08, 2015STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 21, 2015STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 24, 2015STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 08, 2015MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO CROSS-MOTION AND IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: June 07, 2018STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 27, 2015STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 31, 2018NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 29, 2017ORDER - REFERENCE
Date: October 01, 2018LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: June 19, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: May 02, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: July 07, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: July 12, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #3)
Date: August 02, 2018INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 23, 2018INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT
Date: January 17, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #3)
Date: August 02, 2018ORDER - OTHER
Date: July 30, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: July 12, 2018LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: July 07, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #3)
Date: August 02, 2018ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) *Corrected*
Date: July 12, 2018STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: June 20, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 24, 2015NOTICE OF PENDENCY NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION.pdf Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: July 08, 2015AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 21, 2015AFFIRMATION COM NOT REQ.pdf Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: July 08, 2015AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 27, 2015AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 27, 2015AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 27, 2015AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 27, 2015AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 27, 2015AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 27, 2015AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 27, 2015AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 27, 2015AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 24, 2015NOTICE OF REJECTION
Date: March 01, 2016AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 27, 2015EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 29, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 29, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 29, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 27, 2015EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 29, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 29, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 24, 2018NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION
Date: April 24, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 27, 2015AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 29, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 27, 2015EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 24, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 27, 2015AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 27, 2015AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 27, 2015AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 13, 2015AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 27, 2015AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 27, 2015AFFIRMATION
Date: November 19, 2015EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 24, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 24, 2018ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)
Date: December 29, 2017AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 29, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 25, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 29, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 29, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 24, 2018NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION
Date: April 24, 2018NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 24, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 26, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 24, 2018STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF HEARING
Date: May 01, 2018NOTICE OF REJECTION
Date: April 26, 2018NOTICE OF REJECTION
Date: May 04, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 29, 2017NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: May 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 24, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 29, 2017RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: December 29, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 07, 2018NOTICE OF ENTRY/COPY OF ENTERED ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: October 17, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4
Date: July 12, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5
Date: July 12, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: July 12, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3
Date: July 12, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 23, 2015EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6
Date: July 12, 2018OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: July 27, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #3)
Date: August 02, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #3)
Date: August 02, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #3)
Date: August 02, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 23, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: February 22, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: January 17, 2019NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI)
Date: February 10, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: July 12, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7
Date: July 12, 2018PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: March 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #3)
Date: August 02, 2018APPELLATE COURT DECISION/ORDER (CERTIFIED COPY)
Date: March 17, 2021NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: March 16, 2021RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: May 27, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: April 08, 2021ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: May 03, 2021NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: February 28, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 11, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #3)
Date: August 02, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 03, 2021RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: May 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #3)
Date: August 02, 2018NOTIFICATION FROM COURT
Date: December 10, 2020NOTICE OF ENTRY/COPY OF ENTERED ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: January 17, 2019NOTICE OF ENTRY/COPY OF ENTERED ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: January 17, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #3)
Date: August 02, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 10, 2019NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: February 22, 2021NOTICE OF APPEAL/INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE *Corrected*
Date: January 17, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: October 20, 2021ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: December 06, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 15, 2022AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #4)
Date: January 05, 2022AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #5)
Date: January 05, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED ) *Corrected*
Date: November 30, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #6)
Date: March 20, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #4)
Date: January 05, 2022AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #4)
Date: January 05, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: November 10, 2021AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #5)
Date: January 05, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: May 27, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #6)
Date: March 20, 2022NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE
Date: April 07, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: March 28, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #5)
Date: January 05, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION
Date: March 10, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: May 27, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: May 27, 2021ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: November 08, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: March 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #6)
Date: March 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: March 25, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: March 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3
Date: March 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4
Date: March 25, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 07, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: November 08, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: March 20, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 10, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: October 21, 2021ORDER ( PROPOSED ) *Corrected*
Date: July 20, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: October 21, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #6)
Date: March 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #6)
Date: March 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6
Date: March 25, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION
Date: April 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5
Date: March 25, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #4)
Date: October 14, 2022ORDER - FINAL
Date: July 27, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: March 20, 2022NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: April 26, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: April 05, 2022NOTIFICATION FROM COURT
Date: January 05, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: January 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: January 10, 2023AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH
Date: February 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3
Date: February 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3
Date: February 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: February 22, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: February 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: February 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4
Date: February 22, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 22, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: February 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #7)
Date: February 22, 2023NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION
Date: March 12, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: February 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: February 03, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #8)
Date: March 14, 2023NOTICE OF APPEAL/INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: March 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #7)
Date: February 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #7)
Date: February 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #7)
Date: February 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #8)
Date: March 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #8)
Date: March 14, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #9)
Date: March 15, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: March 15, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #9) *Corrected*
Date: March 15, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #8)
Date: March 14, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #9)
Date: March 15, 2023NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION
Date: March 12, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: February 06, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: February 13, 2023ORDER - OTHER Â (Motion #5)
Date: February 14, 2023RECEIPT OF PAYMENT INTO COURT
Date: February 07, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: February 16, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 16, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: February 16, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 17, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: June 04, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #11)
Date: June 04, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #11)
Date: June 04, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #11)
Date: June 04, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #11)
Date: June 04, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #11)
Date: June 04, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9 Â (Motion #11)
Date: June 04, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 11 Â (Motion #10)
Date: June 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #11)
Date: June 04, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 12 Â (Motion #10)
Date: June 05, 2023NOTICE OF APPEAL/INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: June 22, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: June 16, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Â (Motion #11)
Date: June 04, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY/COPY OF ENTERED ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: June 22, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #10)
Date: June 06, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #11)
Date: June 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #11)
Date: June 04, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #10)
Date: June 06, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION
Date: June 05, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 06, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO CROSS-MOTION
Date: June 05, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #11)
Date: June 06, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #11)
Date: June 06, 2023ORDER - OTHER
Date: October 01, 2018DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #3)
Date: December 14, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 22, 2023 | NOTICE OF APPEAL/INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE | ||
June 22, 2023 | NOTICE OF ENTRY/COPY OF ENTERED ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE | ||
June 16, 2023 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
June 06, 2023 |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION (Motion #10) Corrects typo re dates of Defendants' First Notice for Discovery |
||
June 06, 2023 |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION (Motion #11) Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Omnibus Cross-Motion |
||
June 06, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO CROSS-MOTION (Motion #10) Corrects typo re dates of Defendants' First Notice for Discovery |
||
June 06, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
June 06, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION (Motion #11) Corrects Only Typo of Dates of Defendants' First Notice for Discovery |
||
June 06, 2023 |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #11) Corrects only typo re dates of Defendants' First Notice for Discovery |
||
June 05, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 11 (Motion #10) The Estimated Value of Premises $723,000 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.