Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
1015 70Th Street Llc, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Weg, Steven A, against International Underwriting Agency, Inc., Leading Insurance Group Insurance Co., Ltd, Leading Insurance Services, Inc., M&S Insurance Agency Inc., represented by Ahn, Richard J., Briem, Jeffrey, Cunningham, Stephen, Edwins, William John, Longo, Michael Edward, (total of 8) See All in the jurisdiction of Kings County, NY, . Kings County, NY Superior Courts Kings County Supreme Court with Kenneth P presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKenneth P Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2013 |
CategoryTort |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseKings County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time1627 days |
DEMAND FOR COMPLAINT
Date: January 30, 2014LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: December 03, 2014ANSWER (AMENDED)
Date: April 17, 2014MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION AND IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION
Date: April 23, 2014AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION AND IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION
Date: April 23, 2014DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: September 18, 2014MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION (Motion #001)
Date: June 05, 2014MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO CROSS-MOTION AND IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: September 17, 2014LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: September 18, 2014ANSWER
Date: March 11, 2014NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: April 10, 2014ANSWER
Date: October 17, 2014RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: April 10, 2014MEMORANDUM OF LAW (Motion #001)
Date: April 10, 2014DEMAND FOR:
Date: October 12, 2015INTERROGATORIES
Date: October 12, 2015ORDER - OTHER
Date: October 15, 2015STIPULATION - DISCOVERY
Date: September 08, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #3)
Date: September 19, 2016NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #3)
Date: September 19, 2016ANSWER
Date: April 08, 2014COMPLAINT
Date: February 19, 2014STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: March 27, 2014ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: October 15, 2014AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #3)
Date: October 13, 2016LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: January 23, 2015LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: February 04, 2015NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: October 12, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #3)
Date: October 19, 2016NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #4)
Date: January 12, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION AND IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION
Date: April 23, 2014ANSWER
Date: April 10, 2014AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: July 31, 2014AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #5)
Date: October 17, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #6)
Date: July 18, 2017MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION (Motion #7)
Date: September 01, 2017RESPONSE TO STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS (Motion #7)
Date: September 01, 2017MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY (Motion #7)
Date: September 25, 2017MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY (Motion #6)
Date: October 19, 2017STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: September 06, 2017STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: July 26, 2017MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #6)
Date: July 18, 2017RESPONSE TO STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS (Motion #5)
Date: October 19, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #5)
Date: September 01, 2017STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: August 08, 2017MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY (Motion #5)
Date: October 17, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #7)
Date: September 25, 2017STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS (Motion #5)
Date: September 01, 2017LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #4)
Date: February 24, 2017STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: February 28, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #4)
Date: January 12, 2017STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: June 02, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #5)
Date: June 06, 2017STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: August 10, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #6)
Date: September 01, 2017STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: September 12, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #5)
Date: June 06, 2017RESPONSE TO STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS (Motion #6)
Date: September 01, 2017STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: June 19, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #7)
Date: September 01, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #8)
Date: July 18, 2017RESPONSE TO STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS (Motion #7)
Date: September 01, 2017MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION (Motion #7)
Date: September 01, 2017DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #5)
Date: May 23, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #6)
Date: July 18, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #5)
Date: July 18, 2017MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION (Motion #8)
Date: September 01, 2017STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS (Motion #7)
Date: July 18, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #7)
Date: July 18, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #8)
Date: October 19, 2017MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION (Motion #5)
Date: July 18, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #8)
Date: September 01, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #8)
Date: July 18, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #5)
Date: July 18, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #7)
Date: July 18, 2017MEMORANDUM OF LAW (Motion #7)
Date: July 18, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #7)
Date: September 01, 2017STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS (Motion #6)
Date: July 18, 2017MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #5)
Date: June 06, 2017RESPONSE TO STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS (Motion #5)
Date: September 25, 2017STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: September 06, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #6)
Date: July 18, 2017ORDER - OTHER
Date: March 15, 2016ORDER - OTHER
Date: November 04, 2016STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: March 28, 2017COPY OF SUBPOENA
Date: June 02, 2016DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: September 23, 2014AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: June 05, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 10, 2018 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | |
June 15, 2018 | Hearing |
Settled JURY COORDINATING PART 1 4SE0507 (Conversion) Judge: Sherman, Hon. Kenneth P. |
|
June 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #5) Order With Notice of Entry |
|
May 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #7) Order with Notice of Entry |
|
May 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #5) This Memo. decision also decides Motions # 6,7 +8. |
|
May 07, 2018 | Hearing |
Adjourned JURY COORDINATING PART 1 3SE0327 (Conversion) Judge: Jury Coordinating Part, |
|
April 04, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) | |
March 27, 2018 | Hearing |
Adjourned JURY COORDINATING PART 1 2SE1214 (Conversion) Judge: Jury Coordinating Part, |
|
December 14, 2017 | Hearing |
Adjourned JURY COORDINATING PART 1 1SE1020 (Conversion) Judge: Jury Coordinating Part, |
|
October 20, 2017 | Hearing |
Fully Submitted (Motion #007) COMMERCIAL PART 4 Judge: Knipel, Hon. Lawrence S. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.