Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
In The Matter Of The Application Of Country-Wide Insurance Company, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Jaskot, Katherine M., Scoll, Svetlana, against Allstate Insurance Company, Frances Washington, Shamiek Engram, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts Kings County Supreme Court with Debra Silber presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDebra Silber Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2013 |
CategoryContract (Non-Commercial) |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseKings County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time93 days |
PETITION
Date: December 31, 2013NOTICE OF PETITION (Motion #001)
Date: December 31, 2013STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: April 02, 2014RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION
Date: December 31, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 03, 2014 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #001) Motion Trial Term 9 PETITION WDN, PER STIP (Conversion) Judge: Silber, Hon. Debra |
|
April 02, 2014 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - OTHER | |
March 06, 2014 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #001) Motion Trial Term 9 STIP (Conversion) Judge: Silber, Hon. Debra |
|
March 05, 2014 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE Stipulation of Adjournment |
|
January 30, 2014 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #001) MOTION PART Judge: Silber, Hon. Debra |
|
January 14, 2014 | Motion |
Compel Arbitration (Motion #001) Decided: 04/03/2014Closed Before Justice: Silber, Hon. Debra Answer demanded: No Judge: Silber, Hon. Debra |
|
December 31, 2013 | Docket Event | petition to stay arbitration | |
December 31, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF PETITION (Motion #001) notice of petition |
|
December 31, 2013 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - D exhibit D |
|
December 31, 2013 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C exhibit C |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.