Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Emily Fiero, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Fruhling, Michael A, Gersowitz, Edward H., Hackwelder, William Edward, against City Of New York, Metropolitan Transportation Authority, New York City Transit Authority D B A Mta New York City Transit, Son Claire Realty, Llc, represented by Counsel, Corporation, Joseph-St. Bernard, Jamila E., Klaben-Finegold, Andrew, O'Shaughnessy, Timothy J., Preston, James George, (total of 7) See All in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts Kings County Supreme Court with Dawn M presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2013 |
CategoryTort |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseKings County Supreme Court |
Case Cycle Time2040 days |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: October 01, 2014NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: May 27, 2014AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #3)
Date: June 15, 2016SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 30, 2013ANSWER
Date: March 05, 2015NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #3)
Date: June 15, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: October 01, 2014ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: February 03, 2014AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #13)
Date: April 23, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #11)
Date: January 13, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #12)
Date: March 01, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #12)
Date: March 15, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #13)
Date: March 01, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #8)
Date: September 14, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #10)
Date: March 01, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #9)
Date: December 13, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #9)
Date: November 12, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #7) *Corrected*
Date: March 15, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #10)
Date: March 15, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #13)
Date: January 31, 2019STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: November 08, 2018NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #10)
Date: January 03, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #9) *Corrected*
Date: March 15, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #3)
Date: December 16, 2016ORDER - OTHER
Date: February 22, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #5)
Date: May 22, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #9)
Date: November 08, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #3)
Date: January 12, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #8)
Date: November 30, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #8) *Corrected*
Date: March 15, 2019ORDER - OTHER
Date: July 24, 2017ORDER - OTHER (Motion #7)
Date: January 04, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #4)
Date: September 15, 2016ORDER - OTHER
Date: April 10, 2015ORDER - OTHER (Motion #10)
Date: May 22, 2019ORDER - OTHER
Date: April 21, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: May 27, 2014DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: December 04, 2014ORDER - OTHER
Date: January 23, 2018STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 10, 2014STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 22, 2014STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 29, 2014ORDER - OTHER
Date: November 18, 2015ANSWER
Date: June 20, 2014AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #7)
Date: November 12, 2018NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #8)
Date: September 14, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #7)
Date: December 04, 2018STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: November 15, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #8)
Date: November 08, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #8)
Date: October 26, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #5)
Date: June 13, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #6)
Date: November 30, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #11)
Date: January 13, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #6)
Date: November 30, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #9)
Date: October 01, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #12)
Date: January 28, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #7)
Date: July 16, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #7)
Date: July 16, 2018STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #7)
Date: October 31, 2018NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #13)
Date: January 31, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #10)
Date: January 03, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #11)
Date: April 23, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #9)
Date: September 14, 2018NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #5)
Date: May 22, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #9)
Date: September 14, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION AND IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION (Motion #3)
Date: January 12, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #12)
Date: January 28, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #11)
Date: March 01, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #11)
Date: March 15, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #7)
Date: August 07, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 01, 2019 | Hearing |
Stay CITY TRANSIT TRIAL READINESS APP DIV (Conversion) Judge: Med Mal Trial Readiness Part, |
|
May 30, 2019 | Hearing |
Adjourned CITY TRANSIT TRIAL READINESS Judge: Med Mal Trial Readiness Part, |
|
May 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER - OTHER (Motion #10) dated 5/3/19 |
|
May 09, 2019 | Hearing |
Adjourned CITY TRANSIT TRIAL READINESS Judge: Med Mal Trial Readiness Part, |
|
May 03, 2019 | Hearing |
Denied (Motion #0012) Motion Trial Term 20 SFO, BY: SON CLAIRE RLTY (Conversion) Judge: Levine, Hon. Katherine A. |
|
May 03, 2019 | Hearing |
Denied (Motion #0013) Motion Trial Term 20 SFO (Conversion) Judge: Levine, Hon. Katherine A. |
|
May 03, 2019 | Hearing |
Denied (Motion #0011) Motion Trial Term 20 SFO, BY: NYCTA (Conversion) Judge: Levine, Hon. Katherine A. |
|
May 03, 2019 | Hearing |
Denied (Motion #0010) Motion Trial Term 20 SFO, BY: NYCTA (Conversion) Judge: Levine, Hon. Katherine A. |
|
April 23, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #13) | |
April 23, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #13) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.